New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:24-cv-01352
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc.
Represented By
Diane Windholz
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Laura Victorelli
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brittany Cole
Represented By
Gregory William Kirschenbaum
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Jacqueline Donajy Carranza
Elefterakis, Elefterakis & Panek
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 08/16 11:30 AM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/16/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time Wed 08/14 4:23 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to restore the action addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Gregory W. Kirschenbaum dated August 14, 2024. Document filed by Brittany Cole..(Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 07/17 11:28 AM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after thirty (30) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DISMISSED as moot, and all conferences and deadlines are CANCELLED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 7/17/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 06/11 2:11 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 7/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Fri 05/10 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/10/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
16 16 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 04/30 3:28 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/14/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 04/30 3:32 PM
(HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 04/29 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/29/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 04/22 4:55 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc...(Windholz, Diane)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/22 4:54 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc...(Windholz, Diane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/02 6:43 PM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Jacqueline Donajy Carranza terminated. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/2/2024) (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/29 10:06 AM
MOTION for Jacqueline Donajy Carranza to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Brittany Cole..(Carranza, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/29 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory William Kirschenbaum on behalf of Brittany Cole..(Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/04 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Victorelli on behalf of Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc...(Victorelli, Laura)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/04 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diane Windholz on behalf of Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc...(Windholz, Diane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/29 2:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. waiver sent on 2/23/2024, answer due 4/23/2024. Document filed by Brittany Cole..(Carranza, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/23 3:22 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/23 2:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brittany Cole. Related document:1 Complaint..(Carranza, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Right to Sue
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/23 10:03 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brittany Cole. Related document:1 Complaint..(Carranza, Jacqueline) Modified on 2/23/2024 (pc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Right to Sue
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/23 1:43 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/23 1:43 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/23 1:44 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 02/23 1:45 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Donajy Carranza to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Caption title reads "Complaint". Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/22 4:03 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carranza, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/22 4:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Brittany Cole..(Carranza, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/22 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Success Academy Charter Schools, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28982827)Document filed by Brittany Cole..(Carranza, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]