California Northern District Court
Judge:Maxine M Chesney
Case #: 3:24-cv-01083
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Marin, CV0001957
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Fluz Fluz LLC
Represented By
Brianna Dahlberg
Rome LLP
contact info
Eugene Rome
Rome LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Owens
Represented By
Gary Brotman
Marquee Law Group, A.P.C.
contact info
Farshid Shawn Azizollahi
Marquee Law Group, Apc
contact info
Poya Ghasri
Marquee Law Group, Apc
contact info

GPO May 28 2024
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/28/2024. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024)
GPO Mar 21 2025
Discovery Order re: 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Remove Redactions from Medical Records filed by Fluz Fluz LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/21/2025. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2025)
GPO Apr 08 2025
Discovery Order re: 37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 38 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/8/2025. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2025)

Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
41 41 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 04/28 9:22 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING THE JUNE 20, 2025, AT 10:30 AM, FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Further Status Conference set for 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Further Status Conference set for 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
40 40 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 3:44 PM
NOTICE by Ryan Owens NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IN PRINCIPLE (Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
39 39 order Discovery Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 04/08 2:33 PM
Discovery Order re: 37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 38 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/8/2025. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 04/07 11:55 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re:37 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fluz Fluz LLC (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
38 38 motion Discovery Letter Brief Fri 04/04 4:41 PM
Discovery Letter Brief filed by Fluz Fluz LLC.(Rome, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dr. Amyanne Freeburg,
Att: 2 Declaration of Alex Purcell,
Att: 3 Exhibit A Under Seal,
Att: 4 Exhibit B Plaintiffs Medical Records Privilege Log
37 37 motion Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fri 04/04 4:07 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fluz Fluz LLC.(Rome, Eugene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Stipulation In Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
36 36 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 03/25 1:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE -FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SET FOR JUNE 13, 2025 IS RESCHEDULED TO JUNE 20, 2025 AT 10:30 AM. Due to the unavailability of the Court, the Further Status Conference has been rescheduled. Further Status Conference reset to 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Joint Status Conference Statement due by 6/13/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
35 35 minutes Discovery Hearing Fri 03/21 2:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Discovery Motion to Compel Hearing -Docket No. 23 held on 3/21/2025 at 10:00 am by Zoom Video Conference. Digital Recording Time: By Zoom: 10:03-10:25. Plaintiff Attorney: Alexandra Purcell. Defendant Attorney: Briana Dahlberg/Elizabeth Rocha. Proceedings: Discovery motion held; argument heard; matter submitted. Court to issue Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2025)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Discovery Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 03/21 12:34 PM
Discovery Order re: 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Remove Redactions from Medical Records filed by Fluz Fluz LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/21/2025. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/21 5:29 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/18 3:02 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Remove Redactions from Medical Records, currently set for March 20, 2025, is CONTINUED to March 21, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. by Zoom video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 3/18/2025. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 03/18 3:11 PM
Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 02/27 5:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 27, 2025. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 02/27 10:33 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Mediation Completion Date filed by Fluz Fluz LLC.(Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 24, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/24 6:12 PM
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. The hearing on 23 Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Remove Redactions from Medical Records, currently set for February 27, 2025, is CONTINUED to March 20, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. by Zoom video conference before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 2/24/2025. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 02/11 12:42 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byFluz Fluz LLC. (Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-] 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Remove Redactions from Medical Records
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
28 28 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 02/04 7:22 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] PLAINTIFF RYAN OWENS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FLUZ FLUZ LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO REMOVE REDACTIONS FROM MEDICAL RECORDS filed byRyan Owens.(Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-] 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Remove Redactions from Medical Records
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF ALEX PURCELL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF RYAN OWENS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FLUZ FLUZ LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO REMOVE REDACTIONS FROM MEDICAL RECORDS
Monday, January 27, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 01/27 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Alexandra Ryann Purcell on behalf of Ryan Owens (Purcell, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 01/24 2:41 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing re: 23 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/24/2025. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/24 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 1/24/2025. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/22 1:31 PM
ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO REMOVE REDACTIONS FROM MEDICAL RECORDS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2025. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
23 23 motion Compel Tue 01/21 4:01 PM
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Remove Redactions from Medical Records filed by Fluz Fluz LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2025 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 2/4/2025. Replies due by 2/11/2025.(Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Brianna Dahlberg in Support of Defendant Fluz Fluz LLCs Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Remove Redactions from Medical Records,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 14 pgs order Order Wed 01/08 4:25 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 8, 2025. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 01/08 10:27 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECITVE ORDER filed by Fluz Fluz LLC. (Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
20 20 order Pretrial Order Tue 05/28 10:47 AM
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/28/2024. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
19 19 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 05/28 10:46 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maxine M. Chesney: Initial Case Management Conference held by Zoom on 5/24/2024. Case referred to Private ADR. Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2024. Close of Fact Discovery due by 4/25/2025. Designation of Experts due by 5/9/2025. Rebuttal Reports due by 6/5/2025. Close of Expert Discovery due by 7/10/2025. Daubert/Dispositive Motion due by 7/3/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Jury Selection/Jury Trial (4-6 days) set for 10/6/2025 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Joint Status Conference Statement due by 6/6/2025. Further Status Conference set for 6/13/2025 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Digital Recording Time: 11:50 - 12:27 - Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorney: Poya Ghasri. Defendant Attorney: Brianna Dahlberg. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2024)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Tue 05/28 10:49 AM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
18 18 misc Case Management Statement Mon 05/20 3:39 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Exhibit A [Parties' Proposed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates] filed by Ryan Owens. (Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
17 17 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 05/17 8:13 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ryan Owens. (Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-]
16 16 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 05/17 1:43 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options intend to stipulate to an ADR process (Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
15 15 misc Statement Mon 05/06 6:37 PM
Statement PLAINTIFFS LOCAL RULE 3-15 DISCLOSURE OF CONFLICTS AND INTERESTED ENTITIES AND PERSONS by Ryan Owens. (Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 05/03 3:51 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 04/04 11:39 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - CONVERTING THE MAY 24, 2024 AT 10:30 AM - INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TO A ZOOM WEBINAR. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/mmc] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,.(tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 04/02 9:13 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Document not properly linked. [err102] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re:12 Answer to Complaint filed by Fluz Fluz LLC (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/01 2:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Fluz Fluz LLC. (Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/21 2:48 PM
NOTICE by Ryan Owens NOTICE OF RULING RE: MARCH 4, 2024 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER (Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
10 10 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 03/04 9:10 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2024. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/4/2024. (tl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/01 4:37 PM
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT COURTESY COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 1, 2024. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 03/01 11:02 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 03/01/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 03/01 8:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 03/01 10:55 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Judge's initials are missing from the case number. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge's name/initials on future filings.*** Re:6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Ryan Owens (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 02/29 12:20 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryan Owens.. (Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 02/29 8:54 AM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Fluz Fluz LLC. (Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 02/23 10:25 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 02/22 4:14 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Fluz Fluz LLC, a Delaware limited liability company identifying Corporate Parent Fluz App Inc. for Fluz Fluz LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 02/22 3:40 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/7/2024. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 02/22 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Marin. Their case number is CV0001957. (Filing fee $405 receipt number BCANDC-19150182). Filed by Fluz Fluz LLC, a Delaware limited liability company.(Dahlberg, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet