Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:24-cv-00369
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 1:50 AM PDT
Defendant
John Ramos
PO Box 161702
Duluth, MN 55816
Plaintiff
Daniel Victor Hancock
Represented By
Rena McDonald
Eclipse Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Duluth News Tribune
Terminated: 07/23/2024
Represented By
Jonathan P Rolle
Wolfenzon Rolle
contact info
Bruno Wolfenzon
Wolfenzon Schulman & Ryan
contact info
Jordan B. Weir
Vogel Law Firm
contact info
Michael Kustra
Wolfenzon Rolle
contact info
Defendant
Jimmy Lovrien
Terminated: 07/23/2024
424 W 1st St.
Duluth, MN 55802
Represented By
Jonathan P Rolle
Wolfenzon Rolle
contact info
Bruno Wolfenzon
Wolfenzon Schulman & Ryan
contact info
Jordan B. Weir
Vogel Law Firm
contact info
Michael Kustra
Wolfenzon Rolle
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
26 26 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/14 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Daniel Victor Hancock. (McDonald, Rena)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
25 25 order Judgment Tue 07/23 3:53 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien against Daniel Victor Hancock. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 07/23 1:29 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Jimmy Lovrien and Duluth News Tribune's. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 7/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
23 23 misc Notice 4m Dismissal Tue 07/23 7:02 AM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Amended Complaint * in this action was filed on * 5/21/2024. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * John Ramos. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 8/22/2024. (DRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
22 22 misc Proposed Order Submission Fri 07/19 8:29 AM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER by Defendants Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien. (Rolle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
21 21 respm Reply Fri 07/12 12:02 PM
REPLY to Response to17 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien. (Rolle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
20 20 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/26 10:08 AM
ORDER Granting16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jordan B. Weir for Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Michael Kustra. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 6/25/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 06/21 11:59 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Forum Communications Company for Duluth News Tribune added. (Rolle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 06/21 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Forum Communications Company for Duluth News Tribune added. (Rolle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
17 17 motion Motion Dismiss Thu 06/20 4:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien. Responses due by 7/4/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/30/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/4/2024. (Rolle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Thu 06/20 3:46 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jordan B. Weir and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Kustra (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7724217) by Defendants Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien. (Rolle, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Reconsider Wed 06/12 2:22 PM
ORDER Denying without prejudice to seeking relief in proper fashion13 Motion for Reconsideration. Attorney McDonald is ORDERED to familiarize herself with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the local rules for this District. Failure to comply with those rules in the future may result in the imposition of sanctions and other significant repercussions. See, e.g. , Local Rule IA 11-8. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Order Submission Tue 06/11 11:23 AM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on13 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Daniel Victor Hancock. (McDonald, Rena)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Motion Reconsider Tue 06/11 10:25 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re12 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Daniel Victor Hancock. Responses due by 6/25/2024. (McDonald, Rena) (DJorder)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Tue 06/04 9:33 AM
ORDER denying10 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/3/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 misc Proposed Order Submission Fri 05/24 1:57 PM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on10 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Daniel Victor Hancock. (McDonald, Rena)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 05/24 1:55 PM
MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re9 Summons Issued,7 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Daniel Victor Hancock. Responses due by 6/7/2024. (McDonald, Rena) (service)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Thu 05/23 3:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Duluth News Tribune, Jimmy Lovrien, John Ramos re7 Amended Complaint. (RJDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
8 8 service Proposed Summons to be issued Tue 05/21 9:39 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Daniel Victor Hancock. (McDonald, Rena)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Complaint Amended Tue 05/21 9:12 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Daniel Victor Hancock. Adds new parties. (McDonald, Rena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Amended
Friday, March 08, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 03/08 10:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Daniel Victor Hancock. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McDonald, Rena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
misc QC Notice Wed 03/06 12:31 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Daniel V. Hancock. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/13/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
3 3 service Proposed Summons to be issued Mon 02/26 2:50 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Daniel Victor Hancock. (McDonald, Rena)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 02/26 10:30 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RJDG)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Attorney Action Required Mon 02/26 1:18 PM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to1 Complaint. Attorney Rena McDonald advised to use the summon forms that can found on the US District Website forms directory and file a proposed summons for each defendant that needs to be served. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Mon 02/26 3:42 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/22 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7595906) by Daniel Victor Hancock. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/3/2024. Proof of service due by 5/22/2024. (McDonald, Rena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons