California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 5:24-cv-00412
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Case in other court:Riverside Superior Court, CVRI2302291
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Andrew Shaun Gahan
Mortenson Taggart Adams LLP
contact info
Michael Donn Mortenson
Mortenson Taggart Adams LLP
contact info
Craig Allen Taggart
Mortenson Taggart Adams LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Rancho Ford, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Shaun Gahan
Mortenson Taggart Adams LLP
contact info
Michael Donn Mortenson
Mortenson Taggart Adams LLP
contact info
Craig Allen Taggart
Mortenson Taggart Adams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Frutos
Represented By
R Roger Kirnos
Knight Law Group LLP
contact info
Maite Christine Colon
Knight Law Group LLP
contact info
Russell W Higgins
Knight Law Group, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
29 29 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 03/21 8:46 AM
JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES AND MOTION FOR COSTS AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 54(D), by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes, in favor of Jose Frutos against Ford Motor Company, Rancho Ford, Inc. Plaintiff is awarded lodestar attorneys fees in the amount of $38,768.00; Plaintiff is awarded costs and expenses in the amount of $4,418.74; Plaintiff is awarded a total sum of attorneys fees, costs and expenses in the amount of $56,313.67. Related to: Notice of Lodging28 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 03/19 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and Expenses 17 , Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Costs,26 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Costs against Ford Motor Company, Rancho Ford, Inc.18(Cutler, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses and Motion for Costs and Expenses Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d)
27 27 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 03/19 10:52 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: In view of the Court's Order granting Plaintiff's motions for attorneys' fees and costs, and the parties' Notice of Settlement, the Court hereby VACATES the final pretrial conference scheduled on March 21, 2025 and the trial scheduled on April 7, 2025. [Dkt. 26, 15]. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Attorney Fees Costs Wed 03/19 10:06 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS [DKT. 17, 18],17 ,18 . For the above reasons, Frutos request for attorneys fees, costs, and expenses under the Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act is GRANTED in the amount equal to $56,313.67. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
25 25 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 02/25 4:17 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court finds that the Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses (Dkt. 17) and Motion for Costs and Expenses Per Rule 54(D) (Dkt. 18) are appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on February 28, 2025. The motions stand submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 02/19 11:42 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert A Hightower counsel for Defendants Rancho Ford, Inc., Ford Motor Company. Adding Robert A. Hightower as counsel of record for Ford Motor Company and Rancho Ford, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company and Rancho Ford, Inc.. (Attorney Robert A Hightower added to party Rancho Ford, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Hightower added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hightower, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
23 23 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Fri 02/14 10:33 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Costs against Ford Motor Company, Rancho Ford, Inc.18 Notice of Defendants Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Costs and Expenses Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d) filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos. (Cutler, Jacob)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 02/14 10:29 AM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and Expenses 17 filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos.(Cutler, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jacob Cutler in Support of Plaintiff's Reply
Friday, February 07, 2025
21 21 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 02/07 11:29 AM
Motion for Attorneys' Fees Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and Expenses 17 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Migler, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of William J. Migler,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 02/07 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney William James Migler counsel for Defendants Rancho Ford, Inc., Ford Motor Company. Adding William J. Migler as counsel of record for Ford Motor Company and Rancho Ford, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company and Rancho Ford, Inc.. (Attorney William James Migler added to party Rancho Ford, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William James Migler added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Migler, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
19 19 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 02/03 9:38 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and Expenses 17 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Costs against Ford Motor Company, Rancho Ford, Inc.18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
18 18 motion Costs Fri 01/31 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Costs against Ford Motor Company, Rancho Ford, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Cutler, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jacob Cutler in Support of Motion
17 17 motion Attorney Fees Fri 01/31 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and Expenses filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Cutler, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration of Roger Kirnos in Support of Motion
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 01/31 1:14 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jacob William Cutler counsel for Plaintiff Jose Frutos. Adding Jacob William Cutler as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos. (Attorney Jacob William Cutler added to party Jose Frutos(pty:pla))(Cutler, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
15 15 notice Settlement Fri 01/10 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (JOINT) filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos. (Higgins, Russell)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
14 14 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Mon 04/22 2:56 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/24/2025. (iva)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 04/22 2:55 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2024. Motions due by 1/3/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/24/2025. Motion set for hearing on 3/14/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2025 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Jury Trial set for 4/7/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/16 4:58 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on 4/19/2024 1:00 PM is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 04/05 4:29 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos..(Higgins, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
Sunday, March 03, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Sun 03/03 11:29 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Sun 03/03 8:22 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 02/26 1:32 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Russell W Higgins counsel for Plaintiff Jose Frutos. Maite Colon is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos. (Higgins, Russell)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 02/26 10:40 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Russell W Higgins counsel for Plaintiff Jose Frutos. Adding Russell Higgins as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos. (Attorney Russell W Higgins added to party Jose Frutos(pty:pla))(Higgins, Russell)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 02/23 2:54 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 02/23 2:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 02/23 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 02/22 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Gahan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 02/22 5:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Gahan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/22 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVRI2302291 Receipt No: ACACDC-36962683 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attorney Andrew Shaun Gahan added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Gahan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of A. Gahan,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 02/23 11:07 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jose Frutos in Riverside Superior Court on 5/2/2023, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 02/23 2:17 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Ford Motor Company and Rancho Ford, Inc. in Riverside Superior Court on 1/18/2024, attached as Exhibit 5. (jtil)
Related: [-]