New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:24-cv-01279
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Terminated:Nov 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2024 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Ephraim Sher
Represented By
Sara A. Aksu
Book Law LLP
contact info
Nadav Zamir
Book Law LLP
contact info
Chaim B. Book
Book Law LLP
contact info
Defendant
Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe
Represented By
Sara A. Aksu
Book Law LLP
contact info
Nadav Zamir
Book Law LLP
contact info
Chaim B. Book
Book Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Leonides Caguana
Represented By
Andrew Ross Sack
contact info
Jacob Aronauer
The Law Offices Of Jacob Aronauer
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, November 04, 2024
24 24 order Judgment Mon 11/04 3:23 PM
JUDGMENT It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Leonides Caguana and against Defendants Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe d.b.a. Yeshivath Zichron Moshe and Ephraim Sher in the sum of $15,000. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/4/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
23 23 misc Proposed Judgment Fri 11/01 11:35 AM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Re: Document No.22 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment. Document filed by Leonides Caguana..(Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 11/01 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT . Document filed by Leonides Caguana..(Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Fri 11/01 11:53 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Document No. 22 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 11/01 11:54 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 23 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Thu 07/25 3:26 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from both Parties dated July 25, 2024 re: settlement status. Document filed by Ephraim Sher, Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe..(Aksu, Sara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/24 4:41 PM
CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is adopted, after consultation withcounsel and any unrepresented parties, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and 26(f):All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before aMagistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is not to be tried to a jury. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of the trial is 2-3 days. Motions due by 8/23/2024. Deposition due by 11/15/2024. Fact Discovery due by 11/21/2024. Discovery due by 11/21/2024. Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern via telephone conference. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 7/24/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 07/24 1:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip M. Halpern: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/24/2024. Counsel for all parties appeared by telephone. Civil case discovery plan and scheduling order will be separately docketed. The Court also directed that by 7/25/2024, the parties write a letter to the Court providing an update on the settlement status. (Court Reporter AT&T teleconference) (mf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 07/16 9:56 AM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Leonides Caguana..(Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 06/28 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. Initial Conference set for 7/24/2024 at 12:30 PM before Judge Philip M. Halpern. (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 06/17 9:44 AM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Ephraim Sher, Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe..(Aksu, Sara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
16 16 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 06/05 12:41 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:15 Letter filed by Leonides Caguana.ENDORSEMENT In light of Plaintiff's letter notifying the Court that Defendants consented to the filing of an amended complaint (Doc. 15), the Court construes Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Doc. 13) as the operative pleading in this action. Defendants shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint by June 14, 2024. SO ORDERED. Ephraim Sher answer due 6/14/2024; Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe answer due 6/14/2024. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/5/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Tue 06/04 12:08 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Andrew Ross Sack, Esq. and Jacob Aronauer, Esq. dated June 4, 2024 re: Response to Order dated June 3, 2024 (ECF Doc. No. 14). Document filed by Leonides Caguana..(Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 06/03 4:14 PM
ORDER Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to, by June 11, 2024, file a letter: (i) advising the Court of the status of the parties' mediation efforts; and (ii) showing good cause for its filing of the FAC without leave of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 6/3/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/15 1:59 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending12 Amended Complaint, against Ephraim Sher, Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe.Document filed by Leonides Caguana. Related document:12 Amended Complaint,..(Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 05/15 1:18 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacob Aronauer to RE-FILE Document No. 12 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/14 4:24 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Leonides Caguana.Document filed by Leonides Caguana. Related document:1 Complaint..(Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/01 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chaim B. Book on behalf of Ephraim Sher, Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe..(Book, Chaim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
9 9 order Memo Endorsement Thu 03/14 4:25 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:8 Letter filed by Leonides Caguana ENDORSEMENT Application granted. The Mediation Referral Order (Doc.6 ) is vacated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/14/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
misc Transmission to Mediation Clerk Thu 03/14 4:27 PM
Transmission to Mediation Clerk. Transmitted re:9 Memo Endorsement, to the Mediation Clerk for case processing..(jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Wed 03/13 11:27 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Andrew Sack dated March 13, 2024 re: Caguana v. Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe d/b/a Yeshivath Zichron Moshe et al; Case No. 7:24-cv-01279-PMH. Document filed by Leonides Caguana..(Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Wed 03/13 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 4/12/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/29 1:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Leonides Caguana..(Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Mediation Referral Order for Cases Filed Under the Fair Labor Standards Act Thu 02/29 10:53 AM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 3/14/2024. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 2/19/2021) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/22 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nadav Zamir on behalf of Ephraim Sher, Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe..(Zamir, Nadav)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/22 10:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 02/22 9:41 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacob Aronauer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ephraim Sher, Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe d/b/a Yeshivath Zichron Moshe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 02/22 9:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jacob Aronauer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square; Cause of Action code 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/22 9:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jacob Aronauer to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Nature of Suit Error. Place an [X] in one box only. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 02/22 12:50 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 02/22 12:50 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 02/22 12:50 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
3 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Ross Sack on behalf of Leonides Caguana..(Sack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aronauer, Jacob) Modified on 2/22/2024 (vf).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Ephraim Sher, Yeshiva Gedolah Zichron Moshe d/b/a Yeshivath Zichron Moshe. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28970694)Document filed by Leonides Caguana..(Aronauer, Jacob)
Related: [-]