Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:24-bk-40379
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 22, 2024

Debtor
GM Cargo Forwarders, Inc
3244 Greenleaf Ave
Wilmette, IL 60091-2010
Represented By
Vincent S Lobue
Lobue Law, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Mark A. Weisbart
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 10501 N Central Expy Suite 106
Dallas, TX 75231
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702


Docket last updated: 02/23/2024 12:02 AM CST
Thursday, February 22, 2024
misc Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Thu 02/22 11:13 AM
Matrix (Uploaded Electronically) Filed by GM Cargo Forwarders, Inc Document Due 02/29/2024. (Lobue, Vincent)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 02/22 11:13 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-40379 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A13225860, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 02/22 11:12 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition With Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by GM Cargo Forwarders, Inc, Document Due 02/29/2024.(Lobue, Vincent)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration for Electronic Filing Thu 02/22 11:18 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; and (3) the attorney will maintain the originally signed declaration for at least one year after final disposition of the case. Filed by GM Cargo Forwarders, Inc Related [+]. (Lobue, Vincent)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition With Schedules, Statements, and All Other Required Documents. Filed by GM Cargo Forwarders, Inc, Document Due 02/29/2024. filed by Debtor GM Cargo Forwarders, Inc
3 3 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Thu 02/22 11:49 PM
341(a)
Related: [-]