Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00041
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 23, 2024 2:27 AM EST
Defendant
Joel Huntsman (1)
Represented By
Allison Kahl
Federal Defender'S Office Connecticut
contact info
Daniel Murphy Erwin
Federal Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Vanessa Roberts Avery
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Daniel Cummings
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2024 4:23 AM EST
Friday, January 20, 2023
Set Deadline as to Joel Huntsman: Unseal Deadline due by 2/20/2023 (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Joel Huntsman (1). (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 SEALED MOTION To Seal - by USA as to Joel Huntsman. (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Sealed Motion as to Joel Huntsman (1). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 1/20/2023. (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
Arrest of Joel Huntsman (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
CASE UNSEALED as to Joel Huntsman (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Joel Huntsman. (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Joel Huntsman. (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Joel Huntsman. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 01/25/2023. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: granting5 Motion for Pretrial Detention as to Joel Huntsman (1); granting 6 Motion to Unseal Case as to Joel Huntsman (1); Initial Appearance as to Joel Huntsman held on 1/25/2023; Detention Hearing as to Joel Huntsman held on 1/25/2023; Motion Hearing as to Joel Huntsman held on 1/25/2023 re5 MOTION for Pretrial Detention filed by USA, 6 MOTION to Unseal Case filed by USA ; Added attorney Daniel Murphy Erwin for Joel Huntsman. ; Case Unsealed; (Bond Hearing set for 1/30/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector. Probable Cause Hearing set for 2/8/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector). 24 minutes (Court Reporter CourtSmart.) (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
9 9 USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to Joel Huntsman on 1/25/2023 (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
10 10 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joel Huntsman (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Joel Huntsman pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No.116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020). Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 1/25/2023. (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
12 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL as to Joel Huntsman - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 1/25/2023. (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
13 13 STATUS REPORT RE: January 30 Detention Hearing by Joel Huntsman (Erwin, Daniel) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Joel Huntsman: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 9:30 AM. Bond Hearing set for 1/30/2023 03:00 PM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION for Bond Release Pursuant to Conditions by Joel Huntsman. (Erwin, Daniel) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
16 16 NOTICE Withdrawal Of Bond Motion by Joel Huntsman re15 MOTION for Bond Release Pursuant to Conditions (Erwin, Daniel) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: denying15 Motion for Bond as to Joel Huntsman (1); Bond Hearing as to Joel Huntsman held on 1/30/2023; Motion Hearing as to Joel Huntsman held on 1/30/2023 re15 MOTION for Bond Release Pursuant to Conditions filed by Joel Huntsman. 11 minutes (Court Reporter CourtSmart.) (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER as to Joel Huntsman re15 MOTION for Bond Release Pursuant to Conditions filed by Joel Huntsman. The defendant has filed a notice on the docket that he is withdrawing his request for release at this time and is consenting to the Order of Detention that was previously issued, without prejudice to reconsideration should he file a renewed motion for release. Given the timing of the filing of the notice withdrawing the motion for release, the Court conducted the bond hearing today, reviewed the contents of the pretrial services report prepared in anticipation of the bond hearing and, at defense counsel's request, agreed to deny the motion for release without prejudice to re-filing at a later date. If the defendant would like the Court to hold another bond hearing, his counsel should file a motion on the docket, and the Court will schedule another hearing without delay. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 01/30/2023. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
19 19 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by Joel Huntsman.(Erwin, Daniel) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Speedy Trial Waiver
20 20 ORDER granting19 Motion to Continue as to Joel Huntsman (1). The defendant's Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing is hereby GRANTED. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained pending trial. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer with the defendant, review discovery that will be provided by the government and consider the possibility of a pre-indictment resolution to this case. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including May 9, 2023. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for February 8, 2023, is hereby continued to May 9, 2023 at 9:30AM, and the time from February 6, 2023, through and including May 9, 2023, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 02/06/2023. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
21 21 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Joel Huntsman: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 2/8/2023. Probable Cause Hearing set for 5/9/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
22 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison Kahl appearing for Joel Huntsman (Kahl, Allison) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
23 23 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by Joel Huntsman.(Kahl, Allison) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Speedy Trial Waiver
24 24 ORDER granting23 Motion to Continue as to Joel Huntsman (1). The defendant's Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing is hereby GRANTED. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained pending trial. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer with the defendant, review discovery that was recently provided by the government and consider the possibility of a pre-indictment resolution to this case. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including August 7, 2023. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for May 9, 2023, is hereby continued to August 2, 2023 at 9:30AM, as the Court is not available on August 7, 2023, and the time from May 9, 2023, through and including August 2, 2023, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 04/28/2023. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
25 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Joel Huntsman: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 5/9/2023. Probable Cause Hearing set for 8/2/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
26 26 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by Joel Huntsman.(Kahl, Allison) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Speedy Trial Waiver
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
27 27 ORDER granting26 Motion to Continue as to Joel Huntsman (1). The defendant's Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing is hereby GRANTED. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained pending trial. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer with the defendant, and consider the possibility of a pre-indictment resolution to this case. The defendant and the government are in active and ongoing discussions about a resolution, and the defendant would like to continue to pursue those discussions. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including November 2, 2023. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for August 2, 2023, is hereby continued to November 1, 2023 at 9:30AM, and the time from August 2, 2023, through and including November 1, 2023, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Given that this case commenced in January 2023, the Court is unlikely to grant any additional continuances of the probable cause hearing absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 08/01/2023. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
28 28 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Joel Huntsman: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 8/2/2023. Probable Cause Hearing set for 11/1/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
29 29 MOTION to Seal Consent Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing by Joel Huntsman. (Kahl, Allison) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
30 30 SEALED MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing (Consent) - by Joel Huntsman.(Kahl, Allison) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Speedy Trial
31 31 ORDER granting30 Sealed Motion as to Joel Huntsman (1). The defendant's Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing is hereby GRANTED. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained pending trial. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer with the defendant, and consider the possibility of a pre-indictment resolution to this case. The defendant and the government are in active and ongoing discussions about a resolution, and the defendant would like to continue to pursue those discussions. In addition, the motion sets out an extraordinary circumstance justifying the continuance that is separate from the justification provided in prior continuance motions. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including January 31, 2024. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for November 1, 2023, is hereby continued to January 30, 2024 at 9:30AM, and the time from November 1, 2023, through and including January 30, 2024, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. Given that this case commenced in January 2023, the Court is unlikely to grant any additional continuances of the probable cause hearing absent extraordinary circumstances beyond those already discussed in the present continuance motion. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 10/27/2023. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER granting29 Motion to Seal as to Joel Huntsman (1). For the compelling reasons articulated in the motion to seal (Doc. No.29 ), and in light of the content of the motion to continue (Doc. No.30 ), the Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain Document No. 30 under seal until further order of the Court. This sealing order is narrowly tailored in that the Court has not sealed any other continuance request and the Order granting the continuance was not placed under seal. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 10/27/2023. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
33 33 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Joel Huntsman: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 11/1/2023. Probable Cause Hearing set for 1/30/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
34 34 MOTION to Seal Consent Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing by Joel Huntsman. (Kahl, Allison) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
35 35 Consent SEALED MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing - by Joel Huntsman.(Kahl, Allison) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Speedy Trial
Thursday, January 25, 2024
36 36 ORDER granting34 Motion to Seal as to Joel Huntsman (1). The motion is granted based on the compelling reasons set forth in the motion to seal. Moreover, the motion is narrowly tailored in that only the three-page motion is sealed, not the Court's order granting the motion or any of the previous motions to continue and orders to continue. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 01/25/2024. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
37 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part35 Sealed Motion as to Joel Huntsman (1). The defendant's Motion to Continue Probable Cause Hearing for sixty days is hereby GRANTED in part. The motion seeks a continuance of the deadlines set forth in both 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b), requiring that an indictment or information be filed within 30 days of a defendant's arrest, and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, requiring that a preliminary hearing be held within 14 days of the initial appearance of a defendant who is detained pending trial. Counsel for the defendant represents that additional time is needed to meet, confer with the defendant, and consider the possibility of a pre-indictment resolution to this case. The defendant and the government are in active and ongoing discussions about a resolution, and the defendant would like to continue to pursue those discussions, as indicated in prior orders. In addition, the motion sets out an extraordinary circumstance justifying the continuance that is separate from the justification provided in prior continuance motions. The defendant has filed a written waiver of his right to a hearing through and including March 1, 2024. The Court concludes that a continuance of these deadlines is in the best interest of the defendant; that he knows his rights under the relevant rules and statutes; that the interest of the public in a speedy trial is outweighed by the parties' interest in a continuance in this matter; and that a continuance of both deadlines is in the interest of justice. The preliminary hearing previously scheduled in this matter for January 30, 2024, is hereby continued to March 1, 2024 at 9:30AM, and the time from January 30, 2024, through and including March 1, 2024, is hereby excluded from the calculation of the deadlines set forth in 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b) and Rule 5.1(c) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. As the Court has previously stated, given that this case commenced in January 2023, the Court is unlikely to grant any additional continuances of the probable cause hearing absent extraordinary circumstances beyond those already discussed in the present continuance motion. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 01/25/2024. (Spector, Robert) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
38 38 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR as to Joel Huntsman: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 1/30/2024 at 09:30 AM. Probable Cause Hearing set for 3/1/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom Five, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Robert M. Spector (Langello, Nicholas) [3:23-mj-00041-RMS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
39 39 INDICTMENT returned before Judge Maria E. Garcia with the signature of the foreperson redacted. Grand jury number N-22-1 as to Joel Huntsman (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Langello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
40 40 Unredacted document with FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE regarding Indictment39 as to defendant(s)Joel Huntsman. Access to the pdf document is restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(e). (Langello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
41 41 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL as to Joel Huntsman - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/20/2024. (Langello, Nicholas)
Related: [-]