Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00043
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 23, 2024 3:02 AM EST
Defendant
PRASAD MARGABANDHU (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gregory C. Melucci
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Shaun E. Sweeney
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2024 4:46 AM EST
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
Judge update in case as to PRASAD MARGABANDHU. Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand added. (sms)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal Indictment and Arrest Warrant by USA as to PRASAD MARGABANDHU. (sms)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Indictment and Arrest Warrant as to PRASAD MARGABANDHU (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor on 2/20/2024. (sms)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to PRASAD MARGABANDHU (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (sms) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/21/2024) (sms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/21/2024) (sms). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/21/2024) (sms). (sms).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions,
Att: 2 Arraignment Plea
Att: 3 (2/21/2024) Criminal Case Info Sheet
4 4 Indictment MEMORANDUM as to PRASAD MARGABANDHU (sms)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to PRASAD MARGABANDHU. (sms)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion for Arrest Warrant as to PRASAD MARGABANDHU (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor on 2/20/2024. (sms)
Related: [-]