Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00196
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 23, 2024 1:32 AM CST
Defendant
Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda (1)
Represented By
Judith Odette Pena
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Avery Dalton Benitez
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2024 3:05 AM CST
Sunday, January 28, 2024
Arrest of Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda, filed. (XavierAvalos, 7) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano. 8:1326 INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION on Criminal Complaint as to Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda held on 1/30/2024. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Deft held without bond. The Court advised Defendant of the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Deft requests consultant notification. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally reminded the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; written order to follow. Appearances: Avery Benitez, AUSA; Judith Pena, AFPD. (PTS: Daniel Canchola) (ERO: Christopher Barrera) (Interpreter: Cristina Helmerichs and Priscilla Pastor/used) (DUSM: Seth Whitten) Deft remanded to custody. (JenniferNogueira, 7) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Avery Dalton Benitez appearing for USA, filed.(Benitez, Avery) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 1/30/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano (XavierAvalos, 7) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda, filed.(XavierAvalos, 7) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
3 3 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda, filed. [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (JenniferNogueira, 7) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (JenniferNogueira, 7) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Nadia S Medrano) Parties notified. (JenniferNogueira, 7) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda, filed. (JessicaAlvarez, 7) [7:24-mj-00157]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda (1) count(s) 1, filed. (JenniferNogueira, 7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Victor Geovany Guerra-Villeda, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/21/2024) (JenniferNogueira, 7).
Related: [-]