Alabama Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00006
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Feb 23, 2024 1:49 AM CST
Defendant
Mason Demetrius Fuller (3)
Represented By
Gordon G. Armstrong, III
Gordon G. Armstrong Iii, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Miguel Wayne Hall (2)
Represented By
Arthur J. Madden, III
Madden & Soto
contact info
Peter J. Madden
Federal Defender Organization
contact info
Defendant
Nashon Terral Itez Jones (1)
Represented By
Donald M. Briskman
Briskman & Binion, P.C.
contact info
Samuel Joshua Briskman
Briskman & Binion, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Terrill
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, December 21, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones (1), Mason Demetrius Fuller (2), Miguel Wayne Hall (3). (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Attestation Affidavit with Attachments
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
9 9 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Mason Demetrius Fuller. (Terrill, Jessica) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
10 10 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Miguel Wayne Hall. (Terrill, Jessica) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION to Detain by USA as to Miguel Wayne Hall. (Terrill, Jessica) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION to Detain by USA as to Mason Demetrius Fuller. (Terrill, Jessica) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
13 13 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Mason Demetrius Fuller. Initial Appearance set for 12/28/2023 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
14 14 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Miguel Wayne Hall. Initial Appearance set for 12/28/2023 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
15 15 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones. (Terrill, Jessica) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION to Detain by USA as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones. (Terrill, Jessica) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
17 17 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones. Initial Appearance set for 1/4/2024 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Initial Appearance as to Mason Demetrius Fuller, Miguel Wayne Hall held on 12/28/2023. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5A) (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Preliminary Hearing as to Mason Demetrius Fuller held on 12/28/2023 (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5A) (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
19 19 Order on Initial Appearance as to Mason Demetrius Fuller, Miguel Wayne Hall. Defendants informed of rights. AUSA Kasee Heisterhagen for AUSA Jessica Terrill appeared for the Government. Attorney Gordon Armstrong appeared for Defendant Fuller. AFD Peter Madden (for purposes of initial appearance) appeared for Defendant Hall. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing (Hall only) set for 1/2/2024 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. The U.S. Marshal is directed to PRODUCE the Defendants for the hearings. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/28/2023. (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
20 20 Order on Preliminary Examination as to Mason Demetrius Fuller. Rule 5.1 Hearing held. Court finds probable cause and the matter will be set over for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/28/2023. (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Preliminary Hearing as to Miguel Wayne Hall held on 1/2/2024, Detention Hearing as to Mason Demetrius Fuller, Miguel Wayne Hall held on 1/2/2024 (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5A) (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Arthur J. Madden, III appearing for Miguel Wayne Hall (Madden, Arthur) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
25 25 Order on Preliminary Examination as to Miguel Wayne Hall. Rule 5.1 Hearing held. Court finds probable cause and the matter will be set over for further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/2/2024. (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER OF DETENTION entered as to Miguel Wayne Hall (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/2/2024. Emailed to AUSA, USM, Prob, Deft's counsel (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Initial Appearance as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones held on 1/4/2024. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5A) (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samuel Joshua Briskman appearing for Nashon Terral Itez Jones (Briskman, Samuel) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
28 28 ENDORSED ORDER denying12 Motion to Detain as to Mason Demetrius Fuller (2) for the reasons stated on the record at the detention hearing on January 2, 2024. Defendant ordered released on conditions. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 01/04/2024. (Murray, P.) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
29 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Donald M. Briskman appearing for Nashon Terral Itez Jones (Briskman, Donald) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
31 31 Order on Initial Appearance as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones. Defendant informed of rights. AUSA Jessica Terrill appeared for the Government. Attorneys Joshua Briskman and Donald Briskman appeared for the Defendant. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 1/9/2024 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Defendant ordered temporarily detained pending detention hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/4/2024. (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
32 32 Warrant Returned Executed on 12/22/2023 as to Mason Demetrius Fuller. (jmr) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
34 34 Warrant Returned Executed on 12/22/2023 as to Miguel Wayne Hall. (jmr) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
38 38 Warrant Returned Executed on 12/21/2023 as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones. (cjr) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Preliminary Hearing as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones held on 1/9/2024. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5A) (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
40 40 Order on Preliminary Examination as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones. Rule 5.1 Hearing held. Court finds probable cause and the matter will be set over for further proceedings. The Court ordered Defendant detained and remanded into the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/9/2024. (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
41 41 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/9/2024. Emailed to AUSA, USM, Prob, Deft's counsel (eec) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
42 42 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to Allow Work-Related Travel by Mason Demetrius Fuller. (Armstrong, Gordon) [1:23-mj-00321-MU]
Related: [-]
44 44 5 pgs INDICTMENT as to Nashon Terral Itez Jones (1) count 1, Miguel Wayne Hall (2) count 1, Mason Demetrius Fuller (3) count 2. FORFEITURE NOTICE (cmj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Penalty Page,
Att: 2 Signed Indictment