Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:24-cv-00248
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase & Co
Represented By
Pilar C French
Lane Powell (or)
contact info
Michael Cedillos
Greenberg Traurig (il)
contact info
Timothy J. Long
Greenberg Traurig Llp (sacramento)
contact info
John S Devlin, III
Lane Powell Pc (sea)
contact info
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By
Pilar C French
Lane Powell (or)
contact info
Michael Cedillos
Greenberg Traurig (il)
contact info
Timothy J. Long
Greenberg Traurig Llp (sacramento)
contact info
John S Devlin, III
Lane Powell Pc (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Ponton, Sr
Represented By
Venus Yvette Springs
Springs Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Christina Latta Henry
Seattle Consumer Justice Ps
contact info
Plaintiff
Tomika Ponton
Represented By
Venus Yvette Springs
Springs Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Christina Latta Henry
Seattle Consumer Justice Ps
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
59 59 appeal Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA Wed 01/29 3:15 PM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER (25-578) as to58 Notice of Appeal filed by Tomika Ponton, Ronald Ponton, Sr.. (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
58 58 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Mon 01/27 7:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re56 Judgment by Court by All Plaintiffs. $605, receipt number AWAWDC-8815841 (cc: USCA) (Springs, Venus)
Related: [-]
57 57 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Mon 01/27 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Christina Latta Henry. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Henry, Christina)
Related: [-]