Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Referred: Jared M Strauss
Case #: 0:24-cv-60302
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 5:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Hernandez Construction LLC
Represented By
Diana E. Rafael
Cole, Scott And Kissane
contact info
Mediator
Pam Perry
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Hall
Represented By
G Ware Cornell, Jr.
Cornell & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 03/20 10:55 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case (With Prejudice) The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case and any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/19/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc) Modified text on 3/20/2025 (mr1)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation Wed 03/19 2:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Entire Case with Prejudice by Hernandez Construction LLC(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Final Order of Dismissal of Entire Case with Prejudice
Monday, March 17, 2025
29 29 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 03/18 9:16 AM
ORDER. The parties shall submit a Joint Stipulation for Settlement by March 28, 2025. Failure to timely comply will result in the case being dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
28 28 order Administrative Order Mon 02/24 12:33 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
27 27 adr Mediation Report Fri 02/21 4:19 PM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT held before Mediator Pamela I Perry. Prepared by: Pamela I. Perry. Filed by Pam Perry. Disposition: Settled in full. Mediation held/partially held via video-conference. (Perry, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
26 26 order Order Scheduling Mediation Fri 02/14 2:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Pamela I. Perry, Esq. on Tuesday, 2/18/2025 at 10:00 A.M. EST via Zoom. All parties and counsel must attend. A mediation report shall be filed by 2/21/202. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/14/2025. (pb00)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/14 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Mediation by Hernandez Construction LLC (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation via Zoom
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline Fri 02/14 9:50 AM
ORDER. Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines DE23 is GRANTED. Discovery due by 3/13/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2025. In Limine Motions due by 4/29/2025. Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/6/2025. Calendar Call set for 6/11/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Raag Singhal. Jury Trial set for 6/16/2025 before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline Wed 02/12 10:27 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline by Hernandez Construction LLC.(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time
Thursday, November 21, 2024
22 22 order Order Striking Thu 11/21 3:01 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING21 Notice of Deposition. See S.D. Fla. L.R. 26.1(b) ("[D]iscovery requests, responses, objections, notices or any associated proof of service shall not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders their filing."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 11/21/2024. (emd)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/21 1:54 PM
STRICKEN First NOTICE of Deposition of Jacqueline Hall by Hernandez Construction LLC (Rafael, Diana) Modified text per DE# 22 on 11/21/2024 (nan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Thu 06/27 10:43 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Pamela I. Perry. Mediation Hearing set for 2/18/2025 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/25 8:03 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Hernandez Construction LLC (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation
Friday, May 31, 2024
18 18 order Order Scheduling Mediation Fri 05/31 12:47 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Pamela I. Perry, Esq. on Tuesday, February 18, 2025 at 10:00 A.M. EST. This mediation conference will be held in-person at the law office of Cole Scott & Kissane located at 110 Tower, 110 SE 6th Street, Ste. 2700, Fort Lauderdale, Fla. 33301. All parties and counsel must attend. A mediation report shall be filed by 2/21/2025. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/31/2024. (pb00)
Related: [-]
17 17 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/31 12:10 PM
ORDER TO FILE PROPOSED ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION. On or before June 7, 2024, the parties shall jointly file a proposed order scheduling mediation or request appointment of a mediator by the Clerk of Court, as required by the Court's Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
16 16 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 05/31 11:44 AM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Pam Perry as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/18/2025 at 10:00 a.m.. (Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
15 15 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 04/30 1:02 PM
DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 4/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (emd)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/30 12:50 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 6/2/2025 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal, Calendar Call set for 5/28/2025 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal, Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2024, Discovery due by 2/12/2025, Expert Discovery due by 2/12/2025, Fact Discovery due by 2/12/2025, Joinder of Parties due by 6/14/2024, Mediation Deadline 2/19/2025, In Limine Motions due by 4/2/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2025, Motions due by 2/26/2025, Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/16/2025.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 2/19/2025.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
13 13 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 04/29 8:06 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Jacqueline Hall (Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
12 12 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 04/11 12:56 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/29/2024 Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/08 10:26 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hernandez Construction LLC. (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 03/18 3:48 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Hernandez Construction LLC. Response/Answer due 4/8/2024. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/18/2024. (pb00)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 03/18 2:02 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Hernandez Construction LLC.(Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 03/15 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diana E. Rafael on behalf of Hernandez Construction LLC. Attorney Diana E. Rafael added to party Hernandez Construction LLC(pty:dft). (Rafael, Diana)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
7 7 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 03/04 7:42 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates. Note - Other Affiliates do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/01 4:01 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed And Interested Parties by Jacqueline Hall (Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 02/23 11:42 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/23/2024. (pb00)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Fri 02/23 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/23/2024. (pb00)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 02/23 11:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Hernandez Construction LLC. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 02/23 11:31 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/23 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Hernandez Construction LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17315115, filed by Jacqueline Hall.(Cornell, G)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet