South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Case #: 9:24-cv-00909
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:Mar 21, 2025
Case in other court:Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, 2024CP2700045
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2024 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Gary Stephen Watkins
Defendant
Windy Hill Foliage, Inc.
Represented By
Duke Raleigh Highfield
Clement Rivers (cha)
contact info
Victoria Leigh Anderson
Clement Rivers (cha)
contact info
John Adam Woods
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell And Berkowitz PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Antonio Dwayne Stokes
Represented By
W Scott Palmer
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/21 10:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Gary Stephen Watkins, Windy Hill Foliage, Inc.. (Highfield, Duke)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion for Service by Publication Mon 02/03 2:19 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 21 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/3/2025.(rhei, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
21 21 motion Service by Publication Fri 01/31 2:30 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication by Antonio Dwayne Stokes. Response to Motion due by 2/14/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Palmer, W)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
20 20 service Summons Issued Thu 01/30 12:10 PM
Summons Issued as to Gary Stephen Watkins. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 misc Entry Deletion Thu 12/19 10:33 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 17 Reason: Duplicate of documents filed at ECF No. 16. Date of original filing: 12/18/2024 (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 12/18 4:21 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/20/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/1/2025, Discovery due by 4/3/2025, Motions due by 6/17/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 10/17/2025, Mediation Due by 5/19/2025. (Motions terminated: 16 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order filed by Windy Hill Foliage, Inc., Gary Stephen Watkins) Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 12/18/2024. (rhei, )
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 12/18 4:09 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Gary Stephen Watkins, Windy Hill Foliage, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Highfield, Duke)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Wed 12/18 3:32 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Gary Stephen Watkins, Windy Hill Foliage, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Highfield, Duke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed Amended Scheduling Order
Friday, December 13, 2024
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Unexecuted Fri 12/13 3:46 PM
Affidavit of Service Unexecuted Related [+] by Antonio Dwayne Stokes as to All Parties. (Palmer, W)
Related: [-] stricted Access
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Unexecuted Fri 12/13 3:43 PM
Affidavit of Service Unexecuted Related [+] by Antonio Dwayne Stokes as to All Parties. (Palmer, W)
Related: [-] stricted Access
Thursday, November 21, 2024
13 13 misc Entry Deletion Thu 11/21 8:44 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 9 Reason: Corrected entry was re-filed at12 . Re-filed on same date as original filing: 11/20/2024 (rhei, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Wed 11/20 4:56 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES Berkowitz, PE by Antonio Dwayne Stokes.(Palmer, W)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Wed 11/20 4:54 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES Jaffe, D.O. by Antonio Dwayne Stokes.(Palmer, W)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Wed 11/20 4:52 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES Flood, D.O. by Antonio Dwayne Stokes.(Palmer, W)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Wed 11/20 4:39 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES Berkowitz, PE by Antonio Dwayne Stokes.(Palmer, W)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 05/08 1:19 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/5/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 5/9/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 5/15/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/3/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/20/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/20/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/1/2025, Discovery due by 2/3/2025, Motions due by 4/17/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 8/18/2025, Mediation Due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 05/08/2024. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 05/08 12:05 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Windy Hill Foliage, Inc..(Highfield, Duke)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Rule 26(f) Report Wed 05/08 12:01 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Windy Hill Foliage, Inc..(Highfield, Duke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
5 5 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 04/02 4:34 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Antonio Dwayne Stokes.(Palmer, W)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
4 4 respoth Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal Fri 02/23 9:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Windy Hill Foliage, Inc.. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 02/23 9:32 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Windy Hill Foliage, Inc..(hcor, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 02/23 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024CP2700045. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11607026), filed by Windy Hill Foliage, Inc..(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents