The North Carolina Theatre
North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David M Warren |
Case #: | 5:24-bk-00596 |
Case Filed: | Feb 23, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The North Carolina Theatre
3043 Barrow Dr
Raleigh, NC 27616-3036 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
1. | North Carolina Theatre files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy, suspends 2024 season (wral.com) |
Submitted Tue 02/27/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
78 | 78
claims
Notice of Disputed/Contingent/Unliquidated Claim
Fri 04/26 10:22 AM
Notice of Disputed, Contingent and/or Unliquidated Claim(s) filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of The North Carolina Theatre |
|
77 | 77
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 9:56 AM
Amended Certificate of Service filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of The North Carolina Theatre . |
|
76 | 76
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 9:49 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of The North Carolina Theatre . |
|
75 | 75
amdsch|misc
Schedule E/F|Declaration by Debtor(s)
Fri 04/26 9:48 AM
Amended/Amendment to Summary of Schedules, Declaration by Debtor(s), Amended/Amendment to Schedule E/F - Creditor or Creditors Added / Fee Required filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of The North Carolina Theatre . |
|
crditcrd
none (ADI)
Fri 04/26 9:48 AM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Schedule E/F([LINK 24-00596 5-DMW] ) [amdsch,schef] ( 34.00), Receipt Number A17852271, Amount $ 34.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
74 | 74
court
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order
Thu 04/25 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadline (Public)
Tue 04/23 8:34 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated - Certificate of Service Filed (Gurgone, Christy) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
73 | 73
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/22 12:19 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of The North Carolina Theatre . |
|
72 | 72
misc
Monthly Report
Mon 04/22 11:42 AM
Monthly Report for the Month of March 2024 filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of The North Carolina Theatre. |
|
71 | 71
audio
Mon 04/22 10:28 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [04/22/2024 09:30:15 AM]. File Size [ 3402 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:15 ]. (SubChapter V Status Conference). (admin) |
|
70 | 70
order
Regarding Status Conference
Mon 04/22 9:44 AM
Order Regarding Status Conference . (Donleycott, Sarah) |