Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Aida M Delgado-Colon
Case #: 3:24-cv-01083
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 5:29 AM AST
Defendant
Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By
Joan Schlump-Peters
Nachman & Guillemard, Psc
contact info
Defendant
Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
5677 Airline Road
Arlington, TN 38002
Represented By
Joan Schlump-Peters
Nachman & Guillemard, Psc
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilyn Perez
Urb Lirio Cala 396 Calle San MArin
Juncos, PR 00777
Represented By
Silvino John Diaz-Burns
Ns Pr Law Services PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. LoPalo on behalf of Marilyn Perez (LoPalo, Christopher)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Notice to Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 2:53 PM
NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Christopher R. LoPalo re: 25 Order on Motion to Appear PHV : The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link:[LINK:https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you] . (idg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion to Appear PHV Fri 04/11 2:53 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/11/2025. (wm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/24 1:52 PM
Second Motion to allow Christopher LoPalo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 178535) filed by Silvino John Diaz-Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/7/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Burns, Silvino)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/23 12:39 PM
Motion to allow Christopher LoPalo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8962288) filed by Silvino John Diaz-Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/6/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Burns, Silvino)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Docket Text Modification Fri 01/24 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:23 Motion to allow Christopher LoPalo to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8962288). ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect signature format for Applicant Counsel-PHV. Pro Hac Vice shall use handwritten signature when requesting leave to appear. Local Counsel to re-file.*** (idg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 11:11 AM
First NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Burke, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne A Gruner on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Gruner, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
20 20 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/16 3:40 PM
ORDER. The motion to dismiss at ECF No. 12 is MOOT in light of plaintiff's notice of partial voluntary dismissal at ECF No. 17. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/16/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
19 19 misc Notice to Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/07 5:55 PM
NOTICE TO PRO HAC VICE Anne A. Gruner, Sean K. Burke re: 18 Order on Motion to Appear PHV: The Court has granted your pro hac vice application. In order to start receiving notifications, you must file a notice of appearance using your upgraded PACER account. For more information, visit the following link:[LINK:https://www.prd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-cmecf-what-it-means-you] . (idg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion to Appear PHV Wed 10/02 10:28 AM
ORDER. The motions for pro hac vice applications at ECF Nos. 13, 14, 15, 16 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/2/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Attorney Only Tue 07/23 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marilyn Perez (Diaz-Burns, Silvino)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/12 8:57 AM
Motion to allow Sean Burke to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8741852) filed by Joan Schlump-Peters on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 7/26/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Schlump-Peters, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bar Admissions
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/12 8:55 AM
Motion to allow Anne Gruner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8741807) filed by Joan Schlump-Peters on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 7/26/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Schlump-Peters, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bar Admissions
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/10 3:14 PM
Motion to allow Sean Burke to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8741852) filed by Joan Schlump-Peters on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 7/24/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Schlump-Peters, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bar Admissions
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/10 3:11 PM
Motion to allow Anne Gruner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8741807) filed by Joan Schlump-Peters on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Responses due by 7/24/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Schlump-Peters, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bar Admissions
misc Notice of Docket Text Modification Thu 07/11 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re:14 Motion to allow Sean Burke to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8741852),13 Motion to allow Anne Gruner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number APRDC-8741807). ***FILED IN ERROR - Incorrect signature format as to Local Counsel. Lacking Local Counsel's electronic signature (S/) pursuant to the 2014 CM/ECF Revised Manual, II.C.3.b.*** (idg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Wed 07/03 2:29 PM
MOTION to dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. filed by Joan Schlump-Peters on behalf of Wright Medical Group, Inc.. Responses due by 7/17/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Schlump-Peters, Joan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of L. Latham
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/03 2:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Joan Schlump-Peters on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Schlump-Peters, Joan)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Wed 07/03 2:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Joan Schlump-Peters on behalf of All Defendants. Responses due by 7/17/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Schlump-Peters, Joan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 06/04 12:00 PM
ORDER re8 MOTION to Stay for Settlement MOTION for Extension of Time until August 18, 2024 to File Response/Reply . The motion for stay in light of settlement negotiations at ECF No. 8 is GRANTED IN PART. The Court will grant defendants an extension of 30 days to file an answer to the complaint. The parties may seek further extensions thereof by informing the Court of the progress, if any, of the settlement negotiations. The overall extension(s) will not exceed 90 days. Progress Report due by 6/30/2024. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 6/4/2024.(wm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
8 8 motion Stay Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/29 2:11 PM
MOTION to Stay for Settlement , MOTION for Extension of Time until August 18, 2024 to File Response/Reply filed by Silvino John Diaz-Burns on behalf of Marilyn Perez Responses due by 6/12/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Diaz-Burns, Silvino)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Wed 05/29 2:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Marilyn Perez upon Marilyn Perez served on 3/5/2024, answer due 3/26/2024. (Diaz-Burns, Silvino)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affirmation of Service WMG,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affirmation of Service WMT
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 02/27 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Group Inc. and Wright Medical Technology Inc. Note: Counsel must print all summonses and follow the service requirements set forth by the Rules of Civil Procedure. Electronic issuance of summonses should not be construed as authorizing electronic service. (vrg)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 02/27 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (vrg)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Amend/Correct Tue 02/27 9:48 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct adding Cover, Category & Summons Re:2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Silvino John Diaz-Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/12/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Diaz-Burns, Silvino)
Related: [-] 2
Att: 1 Category Sheet Category Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons WMT,
Att: 4 Summons Summons WMG
Monday, February 26, 2024
3 3 motion Amend/Correct Mon 02/26 11:15 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct by adding Cover Sheet to the Re:1 Complaint filed by Marilyn Perez filed by Silvino John Diaz-Burns on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 3/11/2024. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Related [+] (Diaz-Burns, Silvino)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 misc Notice of Defective Filing Mon 02/26 8:25 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to Wright Medical Technology Inc. et. al., COMPLAINT, filed byMarilyn Perez re: Missing Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet. (vrg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/23 11:47 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-8565665.), filed by Marilyn Perez. Service due by 5/23/2024,(Diaz-Burns, Silvino)
Related: [-]