New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:24-cv-01392
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Brooklyn Tailors, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Paul Sodroski
Sterling Cooper LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Toro
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 06/12 4:45 PM
ORDER: The Court has been informed that the parties have reached a settlement in principle in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to the Court's calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made within forty-five (45) days of this Order. Any application to reopen filed after forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order may be denied solely on that basis. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all conferences are CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/12/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Tue 06/11 11:46 AM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel P. Sodroski, Esq. and Mars Khaimov, Esq. dated June 11, 2024 re: Settlement Agreement and Adjournment of Deadlines. Document filed by Brooklyn Tailors, LLC..(Sodroski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
15 15 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 05/22 4:26 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:14 Response filed by Andrew Toro. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant shall file any motion to dismiss by June 12, 2024, accompanied by a memorandum of law not to exceed 25 pages. Plaintiff shall respond by July 3, 2024, with a memorandum of law not to exceed 25 pages. Defendant shall reply by July 12, 2024, with a memorandum of law not to exceed 10 pages. The parties shall comply with the Court's Individual Rules regarding motions. So Ordered. (Motions due by 6/12/2024. Replies due by 7/12/2024. Responses due by 7/3/2024.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/22/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
14 14 respoth Response (non-motion) Mon 05/20 11:23 AM
RESPONSE re:12 Letter Response to Defendant's Premotion Letter . Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
13 13 order Memo Endorsement Mon 05/13 7:01 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:12 Letter filed by Brooklyn Tailors, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter, addressing the merits of the motion and including applicable case law, by May 21, 2024. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/13/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Fri 05/10 4:48 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel P. Sodroski, Esq. dated 05/10/2024 re: Pre-Motion Letter Pursuant to Rule III.C.2.. Document filed by Brooklyn Tailors, LLC..(Sodroski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
11 11 order Case Management Plan Thu 04/11 5:09 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 9/30/24. If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), by July 10, 2024 the parties shall meet and confer on a schedule for expert disclosures, including reports, production of underlying documents and depositions, provided that (i) expert report(s) of the party with the burden of proof shall be due before those of the opposing party's expert(s); and (ii) all expert discovery shall be completed by the date set forth in paragraph 9(b). This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2 or 3 days. On October 9, 2024 at 4:20pm a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5, 6, 8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar, and to schedule the conference under paragraph 13(c) as a Pre-Motion Conference, even though the conference will be held by telephone. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2024. Deposition due by 9/30/2024. Fact Discovery due by 8/15/2024. Expert Discovery due by 9/27/2024. Telephone Conference set for 10/9/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/11/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 04/11 4:59 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the April 17, 2024, initial pretrial conference is CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/11/2024) (ate)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Wed 04/10 9:02 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Mars Khaimov & Daniel Sodroski dated 4/10/24 re: Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Plan
Friday, March 29, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 03/29 5:59 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel P. Sodroski, Esq. dated 03/28/2024. LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel P. Sodroski, Esq. dated 03/28/2024; granting in part and denying in part7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 10, 2024. The request to adjourn the initial pretrial conference and related deadlines is denied. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/29/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/29 6:00 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Brooklyn Tailors, LLC answer due 5/10/2024. (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Adjourn Conference Thu 03/28 8:00 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel P. Sodroski, Esq. dated 03/28/2024., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel P. Sodroski, Esq. dated 03/28/2024.( Return Date set for 6/10/2024 at 04:20 PM.) Document filed by Brooklyn Tailors, LLC..(Sodroski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/11 5:53 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Brooklyn Tailors, LLC served on 3/11/2024, answer due 4/1/2024. Service was accepted by Daniel Lewis. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 02/27 1:47 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2024 at 04:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. The telephonic conference is public, andthe time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed by that time. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The parties shall ensure they are all dialed into the conference call by the appointed conference time, as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/27/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 02/26 2:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brooklyn Tailors, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 02/26 11:00 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 02/26 11:02 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 02/26 11:02 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/23 2:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brooklyn Tailors, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/23 2:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/23 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Brooklyn Tailors, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28988136)Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]