Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:24-cv-20718
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY
Represented By
Rochelle Antoinette Hall
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
NICHOLAS M. MILANO
Represented By
Daniel H. Hunt
Daniel H. Hunt, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
29 29 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Wed 04/16 12:29 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SCHEDULING HEARING. On March 26, 2025, the Court dismissed this action without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to prosecute this action or appear at the scheduled status conference. [ECF No. 23]. In the Order, the Court gave Plaintiff another opportunity to notify the Court of his intent to proceed with his claims. Id. The Court cautioned Plaintiff that failure to do so would result in dismissal with prejudice . Id. After receiving emails from Plaintiff [ECF Nos. 24, 25, 26], the Court set this matter for a status conference on April 16, 2025. [ECF No. 27]. Plaintiff failed to appear for the status conference despite notice. Therefore, Plaintiff shall appear in person before this Court on May 7, 2025, at 10:30 AM to show cause why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for his failure to prosecute this action and his failure to comply with Court orders. The hearing shall take place before Judge Darrin P. Gayles at the Wilkie D. Ferguson, Jr. U.S. Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Courtroom 11-1, Miami, Florida. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/16/2025. (skz)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Status Conference Wed 04/16 10:22 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Status Conference held on 4/16/2025. Total time in court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (skz)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
27 27 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 04/04 1:05 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting26 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing. The hearing shall take place by telephone on April 16, 2025 at 10:00 AM. Counsel shall enter their appearances telephonically using the following dial-in information: Dial-in Number 305-990-2559; Conference ID 374 050 271# . Please dial in at least ten minutes before the Status Conference begins and wait until your case is called. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/4/2025. (skz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
26 26 motion Continue Thu 04/03 4:15 PM
E-mail Letter MOTION to Continue hearing scheduled for April concerning theDefendant's Motion to Dismiss by NICHOLAS M. MILANO. Responses due by 4/17/2025. (ra)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 4:05 PM
Email received from NICHOLAS M. MILANO on March 31, 2025. (ra)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 4:03 PM
Email received from NICHOLAS M. MILANO on March 31, 2025. (ra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
23 23 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 03/26 12:48 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing action without prejudice. This matter was set for a hearing on March 26, 2025. The Plaintiff failed to appear despite notice. For the reasons stated by the Court on the record, this matter shall be dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to prosecute this action. On or before May 27, 2025, Plaintiff shall notify the Court of his intent to proceed with this case. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this case shall be dismissed with prejudice . Counsel shall provide a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his last known address or another reliable contact method. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/26/2025. (skz)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Status Conference Wed 03/26 10:16 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Darrin P. Gayles: Status Conference held on 3/26/2025. Total time in court: 4 minutes. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (skz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 02/11 5:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Plaintiff's Counsel's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Daniel H. Hunt shall be withdrawn from this case. Within thirty (30) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall advise the Court whether he intends to obtain new counsel or proceed pro se. The Mediation Deadline and the deadline for Plaintiff's Response to the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, [ECF No. 19], shall be tolled during this time. Mr. Hunt shall immediately provide Plaintiff with a copy of this Order by certified mail. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/11/2025. (aci)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/06 12:26 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Daniel Hunt for / by NICHOLAS M. MILANO. Responses due by 2/20/2025. (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Wed 02/05 8:23 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY. Responses due by 2/19/2025. (Hall, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Statement Wed 02/05 8:12 PM
Statement of: of Undisputed Material Facts by PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY(Hall, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Declaration of A. Stewart,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Deposition Transcript and exhibits of Plaintiff,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Declaration of M. Fonte
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
17 17 trial Witness List Wed 12/04 4:02 PM
Witness List by PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY.. (Hall, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
16 16 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 12/03 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added H.T. Smith as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/19/2025 at 9:00 a.m.. (Hunt, Daniel) Modified Text on 12/3/2024 (cds)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
15 15 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 04/17 11:45 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/02 12:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/2/2025 in Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Telephonic Calendar Call set for 5/28/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/26/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/27 10:29 AM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY (Hall, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 03/27 10:03 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine and Migoya, Carlos. (cds)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/27 9:59 AM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY (Hall, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 03/22 8:58 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY(Hall, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order
Friday, March 08, 2024
9 9 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks Fri 03/08 4:19 PM
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re 8 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Sample Proposed Scheduling Order and Magistrate Election Form not attached ; The proposed documents have been attached to this notice. (jc)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Fri 03/08 4:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before March 29, 2024 , the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates. Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/8/2024. (aci)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 03/08 3:15 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY. (Hall, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/29 12:38 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by NICHOLAS M. MILANO (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/29 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel H. Hunt on behalf of NICHOLAS M. MILANO (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 02/29 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/29/2024. (aci)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning/Transferring Case Wed 02/28 9:17 AM
ORDER DIRECTING REASSIGNMENT OF CASE to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings. Judge Joan A. Lenard no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 02/26 8:34 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Fri 02/23 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17316975, filed by PUBLIC HEALTH TRUST OF MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, FL.(Hall, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Complaint and Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Other Filings in State Court Action