Florida Southern District Court
Judge:James Lawrence King
Case #: 1:24-cv-20719
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PRADA USA CORP.
Terminated: 03/21/2024
Plaintiff
Alejandro Espinoza
Terminated: 03/21/2024
P.O. Box 228630
Miami, FL 33222
Represented By
Richard John Adams, Jr.
Adams & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Diego German Mendez
Mendez Law Offices, PLLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 28, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 03/28 11:14 AM
ORDER of Dismissal (With Prejudice) . Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 3/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (jlo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Wed 03/27 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Alejandro Espinoza (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 03/21 3:42 PM
ORDER Granting Settlement DE5 - case remains open. The Parties shall have thirty (30) days to file a Stipulation of Dismissal on the docket. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 3/21/2024. See attached document for full details. (jlo)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 16, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Sat 03/16 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Alejandro Espinoza (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/29 10:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alejandro Espinoza. Alejandro Espinoza waiver sent on 2/29/2024, response/answer due 4/29/2024. (Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 02/26 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to PRADA USA CORP. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 02/26 9:54 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/23 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against PRADA USA CORP.,. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17317391, filed by Alejandro Espinoza.(Mendez, Diego)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons