Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:David A Ruiz
Case #: 1:24-cv-00344
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Russ Cambarare
Represented By
Robert A. Barrett, Jr.
Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Jillian Eckart
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Mark Carpentiere
Represented By
Robert A. Barrett, Jr.
Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Jillian Eckart
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
City of Lorain
Represented By
Steven K. Kelley
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Patrick D. Riley
City Of Lorain
contact info
Edmond Z. Jaber
Mazanec Raskin Ryder
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Jillian Eckart
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Joseph T. LaVeck
City Of Lorain
contact info
Defendant
Estate of Cel Rivera
Represented By
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Jillian Eckart
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Margaret Grondin
Defendant
Lorain County
Represented By
Gregory A. Peltz, II
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Lorain County
contact info
Daniel T. Downey
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Teresa L. Grigsby
Spengler Nathanson - Toledo
contact info
David Moser
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Defendant
Joel Miller
Represented By
Robert A. Barrett, Jr.
Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Jillian Eckart
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Pete Rewak
Represented By
Robert A. Barrett, Jr.
Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips
contact info
John T. McLandrich
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Solon
contact info
Jillian Eckart
Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Rosenbaum
Represented By
Gregory A. Peltz, II
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Lorain County
contact info
Daniel T. Downey
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Jonathan E. Rosenbaum
contact info
David Moser
Fishel Downey Albrecht & Riepenhoff
contact info
Intervenor
County Risk Sharing Authority
209 E. State Street
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Scyld D.T. Anderson
Teetor Westfall
contact info
Andrew N. Yosowitz
Teetor Westfall - Columbus
contact info
Plaintiff
Nancy Smith
Represented By
Jonathan I. Loevy
Loevy & Loevy - Chicago
contact info
Amy Staples
Loevy & Loevy - Chicago
contact info
Elliot R. Slosar
Loevy & Loevy - Chicago
contact info
Kathryn J. Montenegro
Loevy & Loevy - Chicago
contact info
Margaret Campbell
Loevy & Loevy - Chicago
contact info
Margaret E. Campbell
Loevy & Loevy - Chicago
contact info
Amy Robinson Staples
Loevy & Loevy - Shelbyville
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
44 44 1 pgs order Order on Motion for leave Tue 04/22 11:14 AM
Marginal Entry Order granting Defendant's25 Motion for leave to substitute counsel Related [+] as to Defendant Lorain County. Judge David A. Ruiz on 4/22/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-] moving attorney Daniel T. Downey and David C. Moser and adding attorney Teresa L. Grigsby
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
order Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney Wed 02/26 11:04 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's43 Motion for Margaret E. Campbell to withdraw as attorney. Judge David A. Ruiz on 2/26/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
43 43 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/20 5:22 PM
Motion by Margaret E. Campbell to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Nancy Smith. (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 08, 2025
42 42 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Sat 02/08 6:07 PM
Attorney Appearance by Leigh S. Prugh filed by on behalf of Jonathan Rosenbaum, Lorain County. (Prugh, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
41 41 resp Reply Tue 09/03 1:55 PM
Reply in support of39 Motion to strike Defendant Lorain County's 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Nancy Smith. (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
40 40 resp Opposition Mon 08/26 3:20 PM
Opposition to39 Motion to strike Defendant Lorain County's 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Lorain County. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
39 39 motion Strike Mon 08/19 11:08 AM
Motion to strike Defendant Lorain County's 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Nancy Smith. Related document(s)37 . (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
38 38 resp Reply Wed 08/07 3:19 PM
Reply in support of26 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Russ Cambarare, Mark Carpentiere, City of Lorain, Estate of Cel Rivera, Joel Miller, Pete Rewak. (Eckart, Jillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
37 37 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 07/23 11:05 AM
Motion for judgment on the pleadings and supporting memorandum, filed by Defendant Lorain County. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
36 36 motion Extension (other) Tue 07/16 10:12 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 7, 2024 to File Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Russ Cambarare, Mark Carpentiere, City of Lorain, Estate of Cel Rivera, Joel Miller, Pete Rewak. (Eckart, Jillian)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Tue 07/16 2:42 PM
Order [non-document] granting36 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 7, 2024 to File Defendants' Reply in Support of26 Motion to Dismiss. Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/16/2024.(R,AP)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
35 35 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 07/15 10:04 AM
Attorney Appearance by Jillian Eckart filed by on behalf of Russ Cambarare, Mark Carpentiere, City of Lorain, Estate of Cel Rivera, Joel Miller, Pete Rewak. (Eckart, Jillian)
Related: [-]
34 34 resp Reply Mon 07/15 9:47 AM
Reply in support of29 Motion for leave to intervene as a party filed by County Risk Sharing Authority. (Anderson, Scyld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
33 33 resp Response Wed 07/10 5:57 PM
Response to26 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Nancy Smith. (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Wed 07/03 4:53 PM
Order [non-document] granting28 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time until July 10, 2024 to file response to26 Defendant's Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Judge David A. Ruiz on 07/03/2024. (K,SJ)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Wed 07/03 11:40 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's27 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kathryn J. Montengro for Nancy Smith. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/3/2024. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
32 32 resp Opposition Tue 07/02 2:00 PM
Opposition to29 Motion to intervene as a party Motion of County Risk Sharing Authority for Leave to Intervene filed by Jonathan Rosenbaum. (Rosenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Tue 07/02 10:26 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 07/15/2024 to file response/reply to29 Motion to intervene as a party Motion of County Risk Sharing Authority for Leave to Intervene filed by Intervenor County Risk Sharing Authority. Related document(s)29 .(Anderson, Scyld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting CORSA Motion for Extension
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Tue 07/02 11:22 AM
Order [non-document] granting unopposed31 Motion of County Risk Sharing Authority for Extension of Time until 07/15/2024 to file reply to Plaintiff's opposition30 to29 Motion for leave to intervene as a party. Reply due by 7/15/2024. Judge David A. Ruiz on 07/02/2024. (K,SJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
30 30 resp Response Fri 06/28 5:03 PM
Response to29 Motion to intervene as a party Motion of County Risk Sharing Authority for Leave to Intervene , Plaintiff's Response to County Risk Sharing Authority's Motion to Intervene filed by Nancy Smith. (Campbell, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
29 29 motion Intervene as a Party Wed 06/19 10:43 AM
Motion to intervene as a party Motion of County Risk Sharing Authority for Leave to Intervene filed by Intervenor County Risk Sharing Authority.(Anderson, Scyld)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order Granting CORSA Intervention Complaint,
Att: 2 Complaint CORSA Intervention Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to CORSA Intervention Complaint
Monday, June 17, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Mon 06/17 11:11 AM
Motion for extension of time until July 10, 2024 to file response/reply to26 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff Nancy Smith. Related document(s)26 . (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
27 27 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/30 3:27 PM
Motion for attorney Kathryn Montenegro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12582448, filed by Plaintiff Nancy Smith.(Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, May 20, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/20 10:22 AM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Russ Cambarare, Mark Carpentiere, City of Lorain, Estate of Cel Rivera, Joel Miller, Pete Rewak. (McLandrich, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
25 25 notice Attorney Substitution (atty event) Wed 05/08 4:18 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Daniel T. Downey and David C. Moser and adding attorney Teresa L. Grigsby filed by on behalf of Lorain County. (Grigsby, Teresa)
Related: [-]
24 24 resp Reply Wed 05/08 11:34 AM
Reply in support of15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Jonathan Rosenbaum. (Moser, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Thu 04/25 10:14 AM
Order [non-document] granting23 Motion by Defendants Lorain County and Jonathan Rosenbaum for extension of time until 5/8/2024 to file reply to Plaintiff's response/opposition22 to Defendants'15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Judge David A. Ruiz on 04/25/2024.(K,SJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Wed 04/24 4:05 PM
Motion for extension of time until 5/8/2024 to file response/reply to15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Lorain County, Jonathan Rosenbaum. Related document(s)15 . (Moser, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
22 22 resp Response Wed 04/17 7:06 PM
Response to15 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Nancy Smith.(Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Orders
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/16 9:56 AM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Lorain County, Jonathan Rosenbaum. (Moser, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
20 20 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 04/15 11:44 AM
Attorney Appearance by David Moser filed by on behalf of Lorain County, Jonathan Rosenbaum. (Moser, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 04/15 11:43 AM
Attorney Appearance by Daniel T. Downey filed by on behalf of Lorain County, Jonathan Rosenbaum. (Downey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
18 18 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Mon 03/25 1:05 PM
Supplement to Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim - Supplement to Motion to Dismiss, filed by Jonathan Rosenbaum. Related document(s)15 .(Rosenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Journal Entry,
Att: 2 Exhibit Transcript of Resentencing Hearing
Thursday, March 21, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 03/21 2:36 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Russ Cambarare, Mark Carpentiere, Joel Miller, Pete Rewak. (Barrett, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 03/19 10:02 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant City of Lorain's16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until May 20, 2024 to answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Extension applies to Defendants City of Lorain, Joel Miller, Russ Cambarare, the Estate of Cel Rivera, Pete Rewak and Mark Carpentiere. Judge David A. Ruiz on 03/19/2024.(K,SJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
16 16 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 03/18 10:31 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until May 20, 2024 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant City of Lorain. (McLandrich, John)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Mon 03/18 10:27 AM
Motion to dismiss case filed by Defendant Jonathan Rosenbaum. Related document(s)1 .(Rosenbaum, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Resentencing Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Prior Court Decision
Friday, March 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Fri 03/15 2:09 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants' Unopposed14 Motion for extension of time until 4/16/2024 to answer complaint. Lorain County answer due 4/16/2024; Jonathan Rosenbaum answer due 4/16/2024. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/15/2024. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 03/15 6:01 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's11 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Margaret E. Campbell. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/15/2024.(G,CA)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 03/15 6:04 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's12 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Amy Robinson Staples. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/15/2024.(G,CA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
14 14 motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 03/13 2:51 PM
Motion for extension of time until April 16, 2024 to answer filed by Lorain County, Jonathan Rosenbaum. (Peltz, Gregory)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Return of Service Executed Wed 03/13 10:41 AM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Margaret Grondin on 3/11/2024, filed on behalf of Nancy Smith (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/11 12:52 PM
Motion for attorney Amy Robinson Staples to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12450528, filed by Plaintiff Nancy Smith.(Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 07, 2024
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/07 1:04 PM
Motion for attorney Margaret Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12445583, filed by Plaintiff Nancy Smith.(Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Margaret Campbell,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Wed 03/06 2:32 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Mark Carpentiere on 2/29/2024; City of Lorain on 2/29/2024; Pete Rewak on 2/28/2024, filed on behalf of Nancy Smith(Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons City of Lorain,
Att: 2 Summons Pete Rewak
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Wed 02/28 5:40 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon Russ Cambarare on 2/28/2024; Lorain County on 2/28/2024; Jonathan Rosenbaum on 2/28/2024, filed on behalf of Nancy Smith(Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Lorain County,
Att: 2 Summons Russ Cambarare
8 8 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:20 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Russ Cambarare. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_doc Praecipe Wed 02/28 12:37 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Nancy Smith.(Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Russ Cambarare
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
6 6 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 02/27 12:13 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Mark Carpentiere, City of Lorain, Margaret Grondin, Lorain County, Joel Miller, Pete Rewak, Jonathan Rosenbaum. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Tue 02/27 9:39 AM
Notice to Attorney Margaret Campbell. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Tue 02/27 9:44 AM
Notice to Attorney Amy Staples. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
5 5 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 02/26 5:32 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Nancy Smith.(Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons City of Lorain,
Att: 2 Summons Joel Miller,
Att: 3 Summons Pete Rewak,
Att: 4 Summons Mark Carpentiere,
Att: 5 Summons Jonathan Rosenbaum,
Att: 6 Summons Lorain County,
Att: 7 Summons Margaret Grondin
Friday, February 23, 2024
4 4 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Fri 02/23 4:22 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summonses were not provided and were not issued. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Fri 02/23 4:15 PM
Supplement to Complaint, - Corrected Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Nancy Smith. Related document(s)1 . (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Fri 02/23 3:56 PM
Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Nancy Smith. Related document(s)1 . (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/23 3:52 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Russ Cambarare, Mark Carpentiere, City of Lorain, Margaret Grondin, Lorain County, Joel Miller, Pete Rewak, Jonathan Rosenbaum, The Estate of Cel Rivera. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12423666. Filed by Nancy Smith. (Slosar, Elliot)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 02/23 4:20 PM
Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 02/23 4:21 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]