Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Karen L Litkovitz
Case #: 1:24-cv-00092
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Police Officer Jordan Batts
City of Wyoming Police Department 600 Grove Ave.
Wyoming, OH 45215
Represented By
Gary Edward Becker
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Keeley Beers Gogul
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
City of Wyoming
City Building 800 Oak Street
Wyoming, OH 45215
Represented By
Gary Edward Becker
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Keeley Beers Gogul
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Patrolman Drew Jones
City of Wyoming Police Department 600 Grove Ave.
Wyoming, OH 45215
Represented By
Gary Edward Becker
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Keeley Beers Gogul
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Police Officer Ryan Warmack
City of Wyoming Police Department 600 Grove Ave.
Wyoming, OH 45215
Represented By
Gary Edward Becker
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Keeley Beers Gogul
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Fisher
individually and as Co-Administrator Joe Frasure Estate, deceased 222 Water Street
Lawrenceburg, IN 47025
Represented By
Glenda A. Smith
Glenda A. Smith, Attorney At Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Frasure
Represented By
Glenda A. Smith
Glenda A. Smith, Attorney At Law, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 18 2024
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DOC. 11). Signed by Judge Jeffery P. Hopkins on 4/18/2024. (eh)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
52 52 19 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/02 3:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jordan Batts, City of Wyoming, Drew Jones, Ryan Warmack, filed by Joseph Frasure, Lisa Fisher. (sct)
Related: [-]
51 51 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 05/02 3:50 PM
ORDER granting29 plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint. The Court will follow the instant Order with a Supplemental Order providing the Court's rationale for its decision. The Court VACATES the current dispositive motion deadline of May 5, 2025 and will issue an amended calendar order following a status conference with the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 5/2/25. (sct)
Related: [-]
50 50 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 2:30 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Jordan Batts, City of Wyoming, Drew Jones, Ryan Warmack re49 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Manual Filing of Exhibits (Burns, Justin)
Related: [-]
49 49 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/02 2:06 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Jordan Batts, City of Wyoming, Drew Jones, Ryan Warmack. (Burns, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A - Recorded Interview,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit B - Selected Plaintiffs' Interrogatory Responses,
Att: 3 16 pgs Exhibit C - Excerpts of Fisher's Deposition Transcript,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Ryon Warmack,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Drew Jones,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Jordan Batts,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Excerpts of Warmack's Deposition Transcript,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Excerpts of Batts's Deposition Transcript,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Excerpts of Jones's Deposition Transcript,
Att: 10 132 pgs Exhibit J - Declaration of Dr. Ron Martinelli,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Body Worn Camera Recording,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Body Worn Camera Recording,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Body Worn Camera Recording,
Att: 14 4 pgs Exhibit N - Affidavit of Jerome Guest,
Att: 15 34 pgs Exhibit O - Declaration of Angelos G. Leiloglou,
Att: 16 5 pgs Exhibit P - Press Release,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - Affidavit of Brooke Brady,
Att: 18 37 pgs Exhibit R - Declaration of Gregory Gilbertson,
Att: 19 Exhibit S - Excerpts of Brady's Deposition Transcript,
Att: 20 16 pgs Exhibit T - Excerpts of Frasure's Deposition Transcript,
Att: 21 14 pgs Exhibit U - Affidavit of Kevin Illing
misc Docket Annotation Fri 05/02 3:48 PM
USB received in the Clerk's Office this date and forwarded to the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
48 48 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/29 8:12 AM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Lisa Fisher, Joseph Frasure. (Smith, Glenda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Appendix Memorandum Partial SJ,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 1 Crime Statistics,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit 2 House Mean,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit 3 Emails,
Att: 5 11 pgs Exhibit 4 Death Record,
Att: 6 1 pgs Exhibit 5 Ballistics