Utah District Court
Judge:Howard C Nielson, Jr
Case #: 2:24-cv-00137
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 3:32 AM MDT
Defendant
Camo, LLC
Represented By
Kimberly A. Smith
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere
contact info
Jeremy C. Reutzel
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere PC
contact info
Defendant
Harvey L. Carmichael
Represented By
Kimberly A. Smith
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere
contact info
Jeremy C. Reutzel
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere PC
contact info
Defendant
Harvey Carmichael, Inc.
Represented By
Kimberly A. Smith
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere
contact info
Jeremy C. Reutzel
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere PC
contact info
Defendant
Sanskirt LLC
Represented By
Kimberly A. Smith
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere
contact info
Jeremy C. Reutzel
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere PC
contact info
Defendant
Stock Loan Solutions
Represented By
Kimberly A. Smith
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere
contact info
Jeremy C. Reutzel
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere PC
contact info
Defendant
Stock Loan Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Kimberly A. Smith
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere
contact info
Jeremy C. Reutzel
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere PC
contact info
Defendant
Joe D. Thomas
Represented By
Kimberly A. Smith
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere
contact info
Jeremy C. Reutzel
Bennett Tueller Johnson & Deere PC
contact info
Plaintiff
1AF2
Represented By
Timothy Scott Vick
Vick Law Group
contact info
David R. Williams
Pearson Butler PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Avantgarde Group S.P.A.
Represented By
Timothy Scott Vick
Vick Law Group
contact info
David R. Williams
Pearson Butler PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
46 46 17 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/09 6:25 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas with Jury Demand. filed by Avantgarde Group S.P.A., 1AF2. (McNeill, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
45 45 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Compel Wed 03/26 4:10 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2025 re27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Stock Loan Solutions, Sanskirt LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Camo, LLC, Joe D. Thomas, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC. All parties appearing via Zoom conference. At the hearing, Plaintiffs (1) voluntary dismissed all of their claims against the Swiss and Caymanian "Stock Loan Solutions" entities under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and (2) identified two of the Doe Defendants and voluntary dismissed all of their claims against the remaining Doe Defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Based on the information and representations provided by the parties on the record at the hearing and in43 Declaration of Scott Vick in Support and44 Memorandum Regarding Diversity Jurisdiction, the court concluded that Plaintiffs have adequately alleged the citizenship of the remaining parties and that the court has subject matter over this action under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a)(2). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1653, the court directed Plaintiffs to submit an amended complaint no later than April 8, 2025, that correctly identifies the remaining parties to this action and incorporates the information and representations regarding the citizenship of the remaining parties that were provided to the court. Court heard argument on the motion and for the reasons stated on the record granted27 Motion to Compel. Written Order to follow oral order: No. Attorney for Plaintiff: Timothy Vick, Attorney for Defendant: Jeremy Reutzel. Court Reporter: Teena Green. (Time Start: 11:00, Time End: 12:15, Room: 7.300 Zoom.) (mlp)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
44 44 9 pgs respoth Memorandum (NOT to motion) Mon 03/24 5:34 PM
MEMORANDUM re 40 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Diversity Jurisdiction filed by Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas.)(Smith, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Incorporation,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Incorporation on Change of Name,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Amended and Restated Memorandum of Association of SLS Group LLC
Friday, March 21, 2025
43 43 respoth Affidavit/Declaration in Support (NOT to motion) Fri 03/21 10:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT/Declaration of Scott Vick in Support re 40 Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A..(McNeill, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Passport,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Instant Check Mate Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Redacted Passport,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - License Verification,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Resume,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit G - Linked In Landing Page,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Redacted Report,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Cease and Desist Order,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - License Report,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Schedule 13G/A,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Camo Entity Information,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Champion Entity Information
Thursday, March 20, 2025
42 42 misc Substitution of Counsel (Atty) Thu 03/20 6:02 PM
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Jason A. McNeill replacing David R. Williams as counsel on behalf of 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (McNeill, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jarom R. Jones, I on behalf of Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas (Jones, Jarom)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
40 40 order Order Mon 03/17 11:11 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER Although Plaintiffs invoke this court's diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a)(2), they have failed adequately to allege the citizenship of various parties. As for themselves, Plaintiffs allege that "AvantGarde is an Italian Societa per Azioni" and "1AF2 is an Italian Societa a Responsabilita Limita," both of which have their "principal place of business in Milan, Italy." Dkt. No. 3 at 4?5. It is well settled that for the purposes of diversity jurisdiction (1) a "corporation" is "a citizen of every State and foreign state by which it has been incorporated and of the State or foreign state where it has its principal place of business," 28 U.S.C. § 1332(c)(1); and (2) the citizenship of any unincorporated association, including an LLC, is determined by "the citizenship of all its members," which means that the entity is a citizen of every State or foreign nation of which any of its members is a citizen, Siloam Springs Hotel, L.L.C. v. Century Sur. Co. , 781 F.3d 1233, 1238 (10th Cir. 2015); Carden v. Arkoma Associates , 494 U.S. 185, 195?196 (1990). It is the court's understanding that a "Societa per Azioni" is analogous to an American corporation and a "Societa a Responsabilita Limita" is analogous to an LLC or other unincorporated business association. If that is the case, the facts that Plaintiffs allege regarding 1AF2 are not relevant to its citizenship for purposes of diversity jurisdiction. Rather, Plaintiffs must identify each of the members of this entity and properly allege each member's citizenship. And if the court is mistaken about the analogy between an American corporation and an Italian Societa per Azioni, then Plaintiffs must also identify each member of AvantGarde and allege each member's citizenship. Plaintiffs likewise fail properly to allege the citizenships of various Defendants. First, although Plaintiffs allege that Mr. Thomas and Mr. Carmichael "reside[] in the State of Utah," Dkt. No. 3 at 7?8, it is well settled that for individuals who are United States citizens, diversity jurisdiction turns on citizenship, not mere residence; that citizenship turns on domicile; and that domicile is not the same thing as residence. See, e.g. , Mississippi Band of Choctaw Indians v. Holyfield , 490 U.S. 30, 48 (1989); Siloam Springs , 781 F.3d at 1238; Smith v. Cummings , 445 F.3d 1254, 1259?60 (10th Cir. 2006); Whitelock v. Leatherman , 460 F.2d 507, 514 (10th Cir. 1972). (For a non-U.S. citizen, the court instead looks to the actual country of citizenship.) Second, although Plaintiffs allege that "Stock Loan Solutions, LLC is a Utah limited liability company" and identify three of its members, Dkt. No. 3 at 6?9, Plaintiffs neither allege that these are the LLC's only members nor identify and allege the citizenship of the remaining members. Further, Plaintiffs fail properly to allege the citizenship of the SLS members that they do identify because Plaintiffs fail to allege the citizenship?as opposed to the residence?of Mr. Thomas and Mr. Carmichael. Third, Plaintiffs assert claims against two additional defendants named "Stock Loan Solutions"?one "a Cayman Islands entity" and the other a "Swiss special purpose vehicle"?both "solely owned and controlled by Defendants Carmichael and Thomas." Assuming these entities are unincorporated associations of some sort, they take the citizenships of Defendants Carmichael and Thomas, which Plaintiffs have failed adequately to allege. But if one or both of these entities is instead analogous to an American corporation, Plaintiffs must allege the "foreign state by which [each] has been incorporated and... [the] foreign state where [each] has its principal place of business." 28 U.S.C. § 1332(c)(1). Further, if either of these entities does have a foreign citizenship, that would destroy complete diversity. See, e.g. , U.S. Motors v. General Motors Europe , 551 F.3d 420, 423 (6th Cir. 2008); Cf. Strawbridge v. Curtiss , 7 U.S. (3 Cranch) 267 (1806). Finally, Plaintiffs sue "Does 11-20," Dkt. No. 3 at 2, but fails to allege their citizenships, as is required when a plaintiff seeks to invoke a federal court's diversity jurisdiction (as opposed to when a defendant removes a case to federal court and the citizenship of unserved defendants is disregarded, see 28 U.S.C. § 1441 (b)(1)), see Lee v. Airgas Mid-South, Inc. , 793 F.3d 894, 899 (8th Cir. 2015) (cleaned up). At the March 25, 2025 hearing on Defendants' 27 Motion to Compel Arbitration, Plaintiffs shall be prepared to present information sufficient to satisfy the court that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. In particular, Plaintiffs shall (1) confirm or correct the court's assumptions about the structure of the foreign parties (AvantGarde, 1AF2, and the two foreign "Stock Loan Solutions" entities) and provide information sufficient to show the citizenships of each of these entities; (2) provide information sufficient to show the citizenships of Mr. Carmichael and Mr. Thomas; (3) identity all of the members of Stock Loan Solutions, LLC and provide information sufficient to show the citizenship of each member; and (4) either allege the citizenship of the Doe Defendants or move to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against those unidentified Defendants. If, despite reasonable inquiry, Plaintiffs are unable to obtain or confirm certain specific information necessary to determine the citizenships of one or more Defendant, they may offer good faith representations of their belief, based on the information available to them, regarding matters they have been unable to determine or confirm. Defendants will be provided the opportunity at the hearing to address the issues identified in this order as well as to respond to any information or representations offered by Plaintiffs. If Plaintiffs fail to present information and good faith representations sufficient to satisfy the court that there is complete diversity of citizenship between each Plaintiff and each Defendant, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice for want of subject-matter jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 03/17/2025. No attached document (jwt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 03/10 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration : (Notice generated by HCN chambers). Motion hearing set for 3/25/2025 at 11:00 am before Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Non-courtroom hearing to be held via Zoom Conference. (mlp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
38 38 3 pgs misc Request to Submit for Decision Wed 10/16 3:06 PM
REQUEST to Submit for Decision Hearing Requested filed by Plaintiff Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
37 37 14 pgs respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/19 1:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas. (Smith, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
36 36 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 27 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The deadline to file a reply is extended to July 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/20/2024. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/20 4:25 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Smith, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/20 4:43 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 35 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 27 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The deadline to file a reply is extended to July 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 6/20/2024. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
34 34 10 pgs respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/12 1:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Scott Vick in Opposition re27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A..(Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 14 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 6 pgs Exhibit 5
33 33 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/12 1:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
32 32 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 31 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to 27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. The response deadline is extended to June 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/31/2024. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/31 10:49 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 31 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to 27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. The response deadline is extended to June 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/31/2024. No attached document. (med)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/30 11:29 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to27 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiff Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. Motions referred to Daphne A. Oberg.(Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Response Deadline
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
30 30 NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
utility Reassignment to District Judge Wed 05/08 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF NON-CONSENT Consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge under DUCivR 72-4 has not been obtained. Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Magistrate Judge is automatically referred under 28 U.S.C636(b)(1)(A). Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned as the presiding judge to the case. (mh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
29 29 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas. (mh)
Related: [-]
28 28 NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A., Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas. (alf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference Tue 05/07 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A., Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas. (alf)
Related: [-]
misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Wed 05/08 10:50 AM
RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
27 27 motion Compel Mon 05/06 5:52 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas.(Smith, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 47 pgs Exhibit Loan Agreement,
Att: 2 42 pgs Exhibit Loan Agreement,
Att: 3 42 pgs Exhibit Loan Agreement
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 5:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Smith on behalf of Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas (Smith, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment Tue 04/16 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF PRESIDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail to the address on the form. Please do not e-file the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A., Defendants Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas. Form due by 5/7/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
24 24 service Acknowledgment of Service (not for executed summons) Mon 04/15 4:05 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed served on Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas, Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Sanskirt LLC, Harvey Carmichael, Inc. Stock Loan Solutions, LLC on 04/15/2024. Acknowledgment filed by Sanskirt LLC, Joe D. Thomas, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael. Related [+]
Related: [-] utzel, Jeremy
Monday, March 11, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/11 1:36 PM
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy Scott Vick for 1AF2 and Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 3/11/2024. (alf)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 03/11 9:44 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Stock Loan Solutions, LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 03/11 9:42 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Stock Loan Solutions. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 03/11 9:40 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Sanskirt LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 03/11 9:38 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Joe D. Thomas. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 03/11 9:37 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Harvey L. Carmichael. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 03/11 9:36 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Harvey Carmichael, Inc.. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Electronically Mon 03/11 9:34 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Camo, LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
15 15 service Request Summons Fri 03/08 5:02 PM
Requested Summons as to Stock Loan Solutions, LLC. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Request Summons Fri 03/08 5:02 PM
Requested Summons as to Stock Loan Solutions. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Request Summons Fri 03/08 5:01 PM
Requested Summons as to Sanskirt LLC. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Request Summons Fri 03/08 5:00 PM
Requested Summons as to Joe D. Thomas. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request Summons Fri 03/08 4:59 PM
Requested Summons as to Harvey L. Carmichael. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request Summons Fri 03/08 4:59 PM
Requested Summons as to Harvey Carmichael, Inc.. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request Summons Fri 03/08 4:58 PM
Requested Summons as to Camo, LLC. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Fri 03/08 4:53 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of T. Scott Vick , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-4994376, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
7 7 misc Refund Request-Duplicate or Erroneous Payment in a Case Tue 02/27 1:12 PM
REFUND REQUEST FOR DUPLICATE FEE PAYMENT filed by Williams, David. Authorized refunds for credit card or debit card payments will be processed through Pay.gov. Authorized refunds of ACH payments will be issued by check through the U.S. Treasury. A waiting period of up to 30 days may be required before your request is approved. If you have not received your refund after 40 days, please contact the clerk's office and ask to speak someone in the finance department. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
6 6 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Mon 02/26 2:13 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/26/2024. (alf)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
5 5 notice Notice PHV Requirements Fri 02/23 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice mailed to attorney Scott Vick for 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A. (sg)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Ron Vance, for Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A., has been notified that he/she is not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. (sg)
Related: [-]
3 3 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 02/23 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Camo, LLC, Harvey L. Carmichael, Harvey Carmichael, Inc., Sanskirt LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Stock Loan Solutions, LLC, Joe D. Thomas with filing fee previously paid (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-4978634) filed by Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (Williams, David) Modified on 2/23/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. (sg)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 02/23 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-4978634) filed by Avantgarde Group S.P.A.. (Williams, David)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/23 5:15 PM
Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00137-DAO. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 02/23 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 Complaint. The Civil Cover Sheet is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately. (sg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Ineligible Attorney Fri 02/23 5:23 PM
NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Ron Vance, for Plaintiffs 1AF2, Avantgarde Group S.P.A., has been notified that he/she is not in active status or has not been admitted to practice in this court and can not practice before this court. (sg)
Related: [-]