Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:24-cv-00274
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 21, 2024 4:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Alister Charrier
Represented By
Ralph R Alexis, III
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (no)
contact info
Corey Daniel Moll
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (no)
contact info
Glenn B Adams
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (no)
contact info
Defendant
Bo Duhe
Represented By
Ralph R Alexis, III
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (no)
contact info
Corey Daniel Moll
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (no)
contact info
Glenn B Adams
Porteous Hainkel & Johnson (no)
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Liz Murrill
Represented By
David Jeddie Smith, Jr
contact info
Carey T Jones
La Atty General'S Office (br)
contact info
Terrel T Kent
contact info
Plaintiff
Tayjha Alfred
Represented By
Chloe Marie Chetta
Barrasso Usdin Et Al (no)
contact info
Emily R Sauer
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (ca)
contact info
Mark J Cherry
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Lee R Crain
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Katherine M Marquart
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (ca)
contact info
Andrew LeGrand
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (dal)
contact info
Elizabeth A Dooley
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher (sf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
69 69 order Scheduling Order - Hanna/Summerhays/Whitehurst Mon 05/05 1:23 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Trial set for 4/27/2026 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2026 10:30 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/3/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 9/3/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/3/2025. Discovery deadline 11/3/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2025. Daubert Motions due by 12/2/2025. Motions in Limine due by 3/2/2026. Pretrial Order due by 3/25/2026. Bench Books due by 4/20/2026. Trial Depositions due by 3/25/2026. Real Time glossary due by 4/20/2026. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 3/25/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/2/2025. (crt,Jordan, P)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
68 68 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 05/05 11:24 AM
ORDER granting65 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2026 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2026 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/2/2025. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
67 67 minutes Status Conference Mon 05/05 8:16 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/2/2025. Following discussion, the Court granted the Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and re-set trial for April 27, 2026, before Judge Joseph with a pretrial conference on April 1, 2026, at 10:30 a.m. in chambers with Judge Joseph. An amended scheduling order shall be issued. (crt,Jordan, P)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
66 66 order Order Setting Status Conference Thu 05/01 10:16 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: A telephone status conference is set for 5/2/2025 at 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Counsel shall access the call by dialing 1-650-479-3207, access code 2315 350 5623. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/1/2025. (crt,Coreil, H)
Related: [-]