Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00019
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 02, 2024 9:48 AM EST
Defendant
Charlotte A. Brown (8)
Represented By
Christopher Rodgers
Kit Rodgers Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Traythan W. Edwards (14)
Represented By
Mary Newton
The Justice Initiative
contact info
Mary Joyce Newton
contact info
Defendant
Nicholas J. Eskridge (4)
Defendant
Todd M. Evans (1)
Defendant
Henri L. Ewing (10)
Defendant
Robert S. Fugate (7)
Defendant
Christopher C. Gilmore (9)
Represented By
Donny M Young
Donny M Young, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Amber B. Jackson (3)
Represented By
Cullen Michael Wojcik
Whitt, Cooper, Hedrick & Wojcik
contact info
Defendant
Kristy L. Murray (12)
Defendant
James M. Pass (11)
Defendant
Bobby L. Robinette (13)
Defendant
Gary L. Shadden (5)
Represented By
Robert R Kurtz
contact info
Defendant
Joshua M. Vanriette (2)
Defendant
Misty D. Walden (6)
Represented By
Randall E. Reagan
Law Office Of Randall Reagan
contact info
Defendant
Liberty Warfield (15)
Represented By
Jonathan S Wood
Jonathan S. Wood, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brent Nelson Jones
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield: Time excluded from 3/19/2024 until 7/30/2024. Granting 122 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Extend All Deadlines filed by Joshua M. Vanriette. Plea Agreement due by 6/28/2024. Jury Trial reset from 4/30/2024 to 7/30/2024 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Katherine A Crytzer. Final Pretrial Conference reset from 4/16/2024 to 7/16/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 3/28/2024. (JDH)
GPO Apr 12 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 112 MOTION for Revocation of Detention Order as to Traythan W. Edwards (14) signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 4/12/2024. (JDH)
GPO May 10 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 138 Motion to Revoke as to Misty D. Walden (6) signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 5/10/2024. (JDH)
GPO Oct 16 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Henri L. Ewing: RECOMMENDING that the District Judge GRANT Defendant Vanriette's motion to join Doc. 261 in the suppression motion, DENY Defendant Ewing's motion to join Doc.[ 267] the suppression motion, and DENY the Motion to Suppress Intercepted Communications by Wiretap Doc.[ 248]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on October 16, 2024. (JAN)REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Henri L. Ewing: RECOMMENDING that the District Judge GRANT Defendant Vanriette's motion to join Doc. 261 in the suppression motion, DENY Defendant Ewing's motion to join Doc.[ 267] the suppression motion, and DENY the Motion to Suppress Intercepted Communications by Wiretap Doc.[ 248]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on October 16, 2024. (JAN)REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Henri L. Ewing: RECOMMENDING that the District Judge GRANT Defendant Vanriette's motion to join Doc. 261 in the suppression motion, DENY Defendant Ewing's motion to join Doc.[ 267] the suppression motion, and DENY the Motion to Suppress Intercepted Communications by Wiretap Doc.[ 248]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on October 16, 2024. (JAN)
GPO Nov 21 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 289 Report and Recommendations as to Todd M. Evans (1), Joshua M. Vanriette (2), Henri L. Ewing (10); granting 261 MOTION OF DEFENDANT JOSHUA M. VANRIETTE TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT EVANS MOTION TO SUPPRESS INTERCEPTED COMMUNICATIONS BY WIRETAP 248 as to Joshua M. Vanriette (2); ; denying 267 MOTION of Defendant Ewing to adopt co-defendant Evans motion to suppress evidence as to Henri L. Ewing (10); denying 248 Motion to Suppress Wiretap as to Todd M. Evans; denying 297 MOTION for Leave to Adopt Objection of Co-Defendant Evans to Report and ecommendation Denying Motion to Suppress as to Joshua M. Vanriette (2). Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/21/2024. (JDH) (Main Document 332 replaced on 11/21/2024) (JDH).MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 289 Report and Recommendations as to Todd M. Evans (1), Joshua M. Vanriette (2), Henri L. Ewing (10); granting 261 MOTION OF DEFENDANT JOSHUA M. VANRIETTE TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT EVANS MOTION TO SUPPRESS INTERCEPTED COMMUNICATIONS BY WIRETAP 248 as to Joshua M. Vanriette (2); ; denying 267 MOTION of Defendant Ewing to adopt co-defendant Evans motion to suppress evidence as to Henri L. Ewing (10); denying 248 Motion to Suppress Wiretap as to Todd M. Evans; denying 297 MOTION for Leave to Adopt Objection of Co-Defendant Evans to Report and ecommendation Denying Motion to Suppress as to Joshua M. Vanriette (2). Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/21/2024. (JDH) (Main Document 332 replaced on 11/21/2024) (JDH).MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 289 Report and Recommendations as to Todd M. Evans (1), Joshua M. Vanriette (2), Henri L. Ewing (10); granting 261 MOTION OF DEFENDANT JOSHUA M. VANRIETTE TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANT EVANS MOTION TO SUPPRESS INTERCEPTED COMMUNICATIONS BY WIRETAP 248 as to Joshua M. Vanriette (2); ; denying 267 MOTION of Defendant Ewing to adopt co-defendant Evans motion to suppress evidence as to Henri L. Ewing (10); denying 248 Motion to Suppress Wiretap as to Todd M. Evans; denying 297 MOTION for Leave to Adopt Objection of Co-Defendant Evans to Report and ecommendation Denying Motion to Suppress as to Joshua M. Vanriette (2). Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/21/2024. (JDH) (Main Document 332 replaced on 11/21/2024) (JDH).
GPO Dec 02 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 302 SEALED MOTION for Pretrial Release as to Christopher C. Gilmore (9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 12/2/2024. (JDH)
GPO Dec 05 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER [CJA 20] as to Henri L. Ewing: Granting 334 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Cabage. Appointment of Attorney Christopher Scott Irwin. (Updated CJA Information should be obtained by accessing the CJA Panel Information Section of the ED/TN web site located at http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/cja) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 12/5/2024. (JDH)
GPO Dec 05 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER [CJA 20] as to Henri L. Ewing: Granting 334 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Cabage. Appointment of Attorney Christopher Scott Irwin. (Updated CJA Information should be obtained by accessing the CJA Panel Information Section of the ED/TN web site located at http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/cja) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 12/5/2024. (JDH)
GPO Jan 16 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING REPORT as to Todd M. Evans and Joshua M. Vanriette. The Court OVERRULES Defendant Vanriette's Objections to Report [Doc. 354 ]. Accordingly, the Court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS the Report. The Court therefore: (1) GRANTS Defendant Vanriette's Motion to join in Defendant Evans's suppression motion [Doc. 260 ]; and (2) DENIES Defendant Evans's "Motion to Suppress" [Doc. 245 ]. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on January 16, 2025. (RLK)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS AND ADOPTING REPORT as to Todd M. Evans and Joshua M. Vanriette. The Court OVERRULES Defendant Vanriette's Objections to Report [Doc. 354 ]. Accordingly, the Court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS the Report. The Court therefore: (1) GRANTS Defendant Vanriette's Motion to join in Defendant Evans's suppression motion [Doc. 260 ]; and (2) DENIES Defendant Evans's "Motion to Suppress" [Doc. 245 ]. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on January 16, 2025. (RLK)

Docket last updated: 01/04/2025 8:41 AM EST
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to Todd M. Evans, Joshua M. Vanriette, Amber B. Jackson, Nicholas J. Eskridge, Gary L. Shadden, Misty D. Walden, Robert S. Fugate, Charlotte A. Brown, Christopher C. Gilmore, Henri L. Ewing, James M. Pass, Kristy L. Murray, Bobby L. Robinette, Traythan W. Edwards, Liberty Warfield. (JDH)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Indictment as to Todd M. Evans (1), Joshua M. Vanriette (2), Amber B. Jackson (3), Nicholas J. Eskridge (4), Gary L. Shadden (5), Misty D. Walden (6), Robert S. Fugate (7), Charlotte A. Brown (8), Christopher C. Gilmore (9), Henri L. Ewing (10), James M. Pass (11), Kristy L. Murray (12), Bobby L. Robinette (13), Traythan W. Edwards (14), Liberty Warfield (15) signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 2/21/2024. (JDH)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Todd M. Evans (1), charging Counts 1,2,3,4,5,6,7; as to Joshua M. Vanriette (2), charging Counts 1,2,4,5,6,8; as to Amber B. Jackson (3), charging Counts 1,2,4,5,6; as to Nicholas J. Eskridge (4), charging Count 1; as to Gary L. Shadden (5), charging Count 1; as to Misty D. Walden (6), charging Count 1; as to Robert S. Fugate (7), charging Counts 1,9,10; as to Charlotte A. Brown (8), charging Counts 1,9,10; as to Christopher C. Gilmore (9), charging Count 1; as to Henri L. Ewing (10), charging Counts 1,3,11,12,13, 14,15; as to James M. Pass (11), charging Counts 1,3,16,17,18,19; as to Kristy L. Murray (12), charging Counts 1,2,3; as to Bobby L. Robinette (13), charging Counts 1,3; as to Traythan W. Edwards (14), charging Count 1; as to Liberty Warfield (15), charging Count 1.(JDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet - Evans,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet - Varnriette,
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet - Jackson,
Att: 4 Criminal Cover Sheet - Eskridge,
Att: 5 Criminal Cover Sheet - Shadden,
Att: 6 Criminal Cover Sheet - Walden,
Att: 7 2 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet - Fugate,
Att: 8 Criminal Cover Sheet - Brown,
Att: 9 Criminal Cover Sheet - Gilmore,
Att: 10 3 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet - Ewing,
Att: 11 2 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet - Pass,
Att: 12 Criminal Cover Sheet - Murray,
Att: 13 Criminal Cover Sheet - Robinette,
Att: 14 2 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet - Edwards,
Att: 15 Criminal Cover Sheet - Warfield
4 4 Sealed Unredacted Indictment (JDH)
Related: [-]