Tennessee Middle District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00047
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 8:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Danny Ray Jones, Jr. (2)
Represented By
Richard L. Tennent
Federal Public Defender'S Office (mdtn)
contact info
Mary K. Harcombe
Federal Public Defender'S Office (mdtn)
contact info
Defendant
Zachery Manier (1)
Represented By
Peter J. Strianse
Tune, Entrekin & White, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Reginald Lavon Cooper (3)
Represented By
Eileen M. Parrish
contact info
Jay C. Clifton, III
Clifton Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Jeffery D. Mason (5)
Represented By
Benjamin H. Perry
contact info
Defendant
Jesse Ortega (4)
Represented By
David M. Hopkins
David M. Hopkins, Attorney At Law
contact info
William S Pitman
Law Office Of William S. Pitman
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brooke C. Farzad, former AUSA
Doj-Usao
contact info
Brooke C. Farzad
Doj-Usao
contact info
Mitchell Galloway
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 8:24 AM CDT
Friday, January 26, 2024
1 1 12 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Zachery Manier, Danny Ray Jones, Jr., and Reginald Lavon Cooper. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet - Defendant #1,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet - Defendant #2,
Att: 3 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet - Defendant #3
2 2 Warrant Issued as to Zachery Manier. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
3 3 Warrant Issued as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
Arrest of Zachery Manier. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Danny Ray Jones, Jr. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
12 12 Warrant Returned Executed on 1/24/2024 as to Zachery Manier. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Appearance as to Zachery Manier held on 1/29/2024. Defendant appeared with retained counsel Peter J. Strianse. Defendant temporarily detained. Preliminary and Detention hearing set for 2/5/2024 at 3:30 PM. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
14 14 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR - PDF REMOVED*** ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Zachery Manier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/29/0224. (jm) Modified on 1/30/2024 (jm). [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER re Brady Materials as to Zachery Manier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/29/2024. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER as to Zachery Manier: Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 2/5/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/29/2024. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
17 17 Warrant Returned Executed on 1/24/2024 as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Appearance as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr. held on 1/29/2024. Defendant appeared with appointed counsel Mary K. Harcombe. Defendant temporarily detained on motion by Government. Preliminary and Detention hearing set for 2/5/2024 at 3:30 PM. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/29/2024. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
20 20 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Danny Ray Jones, Jr. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER re Brady Materials as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/29/2024. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr: Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 2/5/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/29/2024. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs MOTION for Detention of Zachery Manier by USA as to Zachery Manier, Danny Ray Jones, Jr., Reginald Lavon Cooper. (Farzad, Brooke) Modified date on filed on 2/9/2024 per29 Order (jm). [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
28 28 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr. (Farzad, Brooke) Modified date on filed on 2/9/2024 per29 Order (jm). [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Zachery Manier and Danny Ray Jones, Jr. held on 2/5/2024 is continued to 2/6/2024 at 9:30 AM. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
23 23 Letter from Character Letters & Third-Party Declaration (Strianse, Peter) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Zachery Manier, Danny Ray Jones, Jr. held on 2/6/2024. Both hearings are taken under advisement. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit and Witness List) (ln) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
29 29 2 pgs ORDER as to Zachery Manier, Danny Jones, and Reginald Lavon Cooper: Because the Court's prior order granted the relief requested by the United States' now-docketed motion for Cooper's detention (Doc. No. 27 ), the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to mark the motion (Doc. No. 27 ) as granted by the January 29, 2024 order (Doc. No. 11 ). To provide clarity in the docket, the Clerk's Office is further DIRECTED to docket the motions for detention (Doc. Nos. 26-28) as having been filed on January 29, 2024. This Order will serve as a record of the complete order of events. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/9/2024. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
30 30 1 pgs NOTICE OF HEARING as to Zachery Manier and Danny Ray Jones, Jr: Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 2/16/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
31 31 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Zachery Manier held on 2/16/2024. Defendant detained; order to enter. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Zachery Manier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/16/2024. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
33 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr. Defendant detained; order to enter. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
34 34 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Danny Ray Jones, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/16/2024. (jm) [3:24-mj-01026]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
35 35 2 pgs INDICTMENT filed as to Zachery Manier, Danny Ray Jones, Jr. (ln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet - Zachery Manier,
Att: 2 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet - Danny Ray Jones, Jr.
36 36 SEALED DOCUMENT: Indictment with grand jury foreperson signature. Document sealed pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Criminal Case Files. THIS DOCUMENT IS NOT FOR PUBLIC DISCLOSURE. (ln)
Related: [-]