Utah District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00052
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 24, 2024 12:53 AM MST
Defendant
Reece Dennis Roberts (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tanner Zumwalt
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/24/2024 3:21 AM MST
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
1 1 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Reece Dennis Roberts (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. Assigned to Judge David Barlow (kpf)
Related: [-]
3 3 **SEALED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically in case as to Reece Dennis Roberts. Arraignment and Initial Appearance set for 3/13/2024 at 01:30 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. (kpf)
Related: [-]