Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00169
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 24, 2024 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
Amber Dawn Smith (1)
Represented By
Cody E Gilbert
Gilbert Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Daniel Gridley
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/24/2024 2:55 AM CST
Thursday, February 22, 2024
Arrest of Amber Dawn Smith in Western District of Oklahoma. (lb)
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Amber Dawn Smith (lb)
Related: [-]
2 2 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Amber Dawn Smith (lb)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Cody E Gilbert for Amber Dawn Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/22/24. (lb)
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) as to Amber Dawn Smith held on 2/22/2024, Detention Hearing set for 2/26/2024 12:30 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings by Amber Dawn Smith as to Identity Hearing. (lb)
Related: [-]
6 6 DPPA-ORDER as to Amber Dawn Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/22/24. (lb)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Amber Dawn Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/22/24. (lb)
Related: [-]