California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00138
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 24, 2024 12:09 AM PST
Defendant
Alyssa Rose Lim (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Lynette M. Belsky
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Material Witness
H.M.G.
Represented By
Jonathan D Frank
Law Office Of Jonathan D Frank
contact info
Material Witness
Catalina Martinez-Bautista
Represented By
Jonathan D Frank
Law Office Of Jonathan D Frank
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Louis Brandon Liss
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/24/2024 2:46 AM PST
Friday, December 29, 2023
Arrest of Alyssa Rose Lim (no document attached) (bas1) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Alyssa Rose Lim.(bas1) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Jonathan D Frank appointed for H.M.G. and Catalina Martinez-Bautista. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Alyssa Rose Lim: Initial Appearance set for 1/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Initial Appearance as to Alyssa Rose Lim held on 1/2/2024. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Alyssa Rose Lim. Bond set as to Alyssa Rose Lim (1) $15,000 unsecured (O/R). Abstract issued to USMS. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 1/11/24 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. Arraignment set for 1/25/24 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner.)(CD# 1/2/2024 DDL 24-1:2:14;3:04-3:10). (Plaintiff Attorney Kaley Chan AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Samuel Pope FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
8 8 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Alyssa Rose Lim (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
10 10 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Alyssa Rose Lim. (mme) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS Read Receipt
11 11 ORDER as to Alyssa Rose Lim: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/2/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Alyssa Rose Lim (1) $15,000 unsecured (O/R)... Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/2/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Alyssa Rose Lim (cxl) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
14 14 O/R Bond Filed as to Alyssa Rose Lim in amount of $ 15,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/2/2024. (Document applicable to USA, Alyssa Rose Lim.) (cxl) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
3 3 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Alyssa Rose Lim: Arraignment of MW Catalina Martinez-Bautista set for 1/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lynette M. Belsky appearing for Alyssa Rose Lim (Belsky, Lynette)Attorney Lynette M. Belsky added to party Alyssa Rose Lim(pty:dft) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Alyssa Rose Lim (Belsky, Lynette) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
6 6 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Alyssa Rose Lim: Arraignment of MW Catalina MARTINEZ-Bautista until set for 1/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Louis Brandon Liss appearing for USA. (Liss, Louis)Attorney Louis Brandon Liss added to party USA(pty:pla) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
15 15 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Alyssa Rose Lim: Arraignment of MW H.M.G. set for 1/4/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
16 16 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to H.M.G.. Material Witness to be released to a parent/guardian in accordance with O.R.R.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/4/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Catalina Martinez-Bautista. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 1 FRA and $500cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/4/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Arraignment of Material Witness H.M.G. and Catalina Martinez-Bautista held on 1/4/2024. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Jonathan Frank(n/a).Material Witness bail set at $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRA w/10% percent cash deposit as to Catalina Martinez-Bautista. The minor material witness H.M.G. consents to VTC and is to be released to sponsor O.G.R. (Interpreter Paula Navarro-Gomez, Daniel Novoa). (CD# 1/4/2024 DDL 24-1:2:06-2:15). (Plaintiff Attorney Kaley Chan AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
19 19 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Alyssa Rose Lim. At request of material witness counsel, Motion Hearing - Material Witness set for 1/25/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (mme) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
20 20 MOTION to Take Deposition by H.M.G., Catalina Martinez-Bautista as to Alyssa Rose Lim.(Frank, Jonathan) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Alyssa Rose Lim. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 1/25/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (CD# 1/11/2024 DDL 9:45-9:49). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Lynette M. Belsky, FD). (mme) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
22 22 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Liss, Louis) (rxc). [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
23 23 NOTICE of Lodgment of Stip of Fact and Joint Motion for Release of Material Witness(es) by H.M.G., Catalina Martinez-Bautista, as to defendant: Alyssa Rose Lim. (DDL) (Liss, Louis) (jrd) [3:24-mj-00004-DDL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
24 24 INFORMATION as to Alyssa Rose Lim (1) count(s) 1-2. (mme)
Related: [-]
25 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Arraignment on Information as to Alyssa Rose Lim (1) Count 1-2 held on 1/25/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 2/23/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Material Witness Hearing in case as to Alyssa Rose Lim held on 1/25/2024, finding as moot20 Motion to Take Deposition as to Alyssa Rose Lim (1). Material Witness stipulation entered; abstracts (2) issued. (CD# 1/25/2024 DDL 10:24-10:37). (Plaintiff Attorney Calen Bennett, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Stephen Piotrkowski, FD S/A). (Material Witness Attorney Michael S. Pedretti, CJA S/A). (no document attached) (mme)
Related: [-]
26 26 STIPULATION OF FACT AND JOINT MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Catalina Martinez-Bautista, H.M.G. as to defendant Alyssa Rose Lim and Order Thereon. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 1/25/2024. (sjt)
Related: [-]
27 27 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Material Witness Catalina Martinez-Bautista, re26 Stipulation of Fact and Joint Motion for Release of M/W (sjt)
Related: [-]
28 28 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Material Witness H.M.G., re26 Stipulation of Fact and Joint Motion for Release of M/W (sjt)
Related: [-]