Indiana Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00091
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 24, 2024 3:18 AM EST
Defendant
CARTER ROHN (1)
Represented By
Gwendolyn M. Beitz
Indiana Federal Community Defenders
contact info
Miscellaneous
USM (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
MaryAnn Totino Mindrum
United States Attorney'S Office (indianapolis)
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/24/2024 5:59 AM EST
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
1 1 MINUTE ORDER - for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr as to CARTER ROHN (1); Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings on an Indictment filed on January 18, 2024 out of the District of Columbia (1:24-cr-0038). as to CARTER ROHN (1) held on 1/24/2024. Appearance entered by MaryAnn Totino Mindrum for USA,Gwendolyn M. Beitz for CARTER ROHN on behalf of defendant. USPO represented by Courtney Ratzlaff. Charges and rights were read and explained. Defendant waived his right to an identity hearing, production of the warrant, and any preliminary detention hearing to which he may be entitled in this District. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshals pending removal to the District of Columbia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. (CKM) Modified on 1/26/2024 (CKM).
Related: [-]
2 2 ARREST Warrant Returned by US Marshal. Service of Warrant EXECUTED on 1/24/2024 in case as to CARTER ROHN (1). Electronic Notice to USM-W. (CKM)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by CARTER ROHN (1) (CKM)
Related: [-]
5 5 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to CARTER ROHN (1). Defendant committed to District of Columbia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 1/24/2024. Electronic Notice to USM-C. (CKM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
Notice of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to CARTER ROHN (1). Transferee court case number is: 1-24-cr-38. Using a PACER account, the docket sheet and any documents may be received via the case number link. Any necessary sealed/restricted documents will be transmitted to the receiving district court via a separate e-mail message. If the receiving district court requires certified copies of any documents please send that request to InterdistrictTransfer_INSD@insd.uscourts.gov. (CKM) Modified on 1/26/2024 (CKM).
Related: [-]