Member Case
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-80035

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott W Everett
Case #: 8:24-bk-80036
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2024
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC
2100 W Walnut Hill Ln Ste 300
Irving, TX 75038-3268
Represented By
Lydia Rogers Webb
Gray Reed And Mcgraw LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Friday, December 20, 2024
15 15 order Final decree Fri 12/20 5:12 PM
Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 12/20/2024 (Rielly, Bill)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Thu 04/18 12:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kenneth Stohner Jr. filed by Creditor Third Coast Bank, SSB. (Stohner, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
court Meeting of creditors held Fri 04/05 1:07 PM
Trustee's initial report of meeting of creditors held on 4/5/2024 Related [+] (Bublick, Asher)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of creditors Chapter 11
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
12 12 misc Schedules Wed 04/03 10:22 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC. (Webb, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
11 11 76 pgs misc Schedules Fri 03/29 4:30 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC Related [+]. (Webb, Lydia)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
10 10 misc Statement of financial affairs Fri 03/29 3:58 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC . Filed by Debtor Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC Related [+]. (Webb, Lydia)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
Monday, March 04, 2024
9 9 misc Matrix Mon 03/04 2:45 PM
Creditor matrix Verification of Mailing List . Filed by Debtor Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC Related [+]. (Webb, Lydia)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency
Saturday, March 02, 2024
8 8 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sat 03/02 11:19 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/5/2024 at 10:00 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 7/5/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/23/2024.
Thursday, February 29, 2024
7 7 order Joint administration Thu 02/29 4:28 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 8:24-bk-80035 with member case 8:24-bk-80036 Related [+] An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1(a) of the Local Bankruptcy Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas directing joint administration for procedural purposes of the chapter 11 cases of Cottonwood Financial Ltd., et al. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 24-80035 (SWE). Entered on 2/29/2024. (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
6 6 court BNC certificate of mailing Wed 02/28 11:19 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 3/11/2024. Schedule D due 3/11/2024. Schedule E/F due 3/11/2024. Schedule G due 3/11/2024. Schedule H due 3/11/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 3/11/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 3/11/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due 3/11/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/11/2024. Creditor matrix due 2/28/2024. (Blanco, J.)
5 5 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Wed 02/28 4:55 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/5/2024 at 10:00 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 7/5/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/23/2024. (Nixon, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
4 4 misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Mon 02/26 3:37 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Debtors Amended Top 30 Creditor List . Filed by Debtor Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC. (Webb, Lydia)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice of deficiency Mon 02/26 9:59 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 3/11/2024. Schedule D due 3/11/2024. Schedule E/F due 3/11/2024. Schedule G due 3/11/2024. Schedule H due 3/11/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 3/11/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 3/11/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due 3/11/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/11/2024. Creditor matrix due 2/28/2024. (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint administration Mon 02/26 1:31 AM
Motion for joint administration of cases Cottonwood Financial Ltd.; Cottonwood Financial Administrative Services, LLC; Cottonwood Financial Texas, LLC; Cottonwood Financial Idaho, LLC ; Cottonwood Financial Wisconsin, LLC Filed by Debtor Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC (Brookner, Jason)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 25, 2024
1 1 17 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Sun 02/25 10:41 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Cottonwood Financial Administrative Service LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/24/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 06/24/2024. (Webb, Lydia)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Sun 02/25 10:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 24-80036 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A31177320, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1