California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:24-bk-11385
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2024

Debtor
Abrams Artist Agency, LLC
750 N San Vicente Blvd Fl 11 Ste E
Los Angeles, CA 90069-5788
Represented By
Carolyn A Dye
Law Office Of Carolyn A. Dye
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 03/19/2024 9:21 AM PDT
Sunday, February 25, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sun 02/25 11:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:24-bk-11385] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56529174. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Sun 02/25 11:37 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Abrams Artist Agency, LLC (Dye, Carolyn); Warning: See docket entry no 4 and 5 for corrective actions. Case is deficient for Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 3/11/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 3/11/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 3/11/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 3/11/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 3/11/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 3/11/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 3/11/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 3/11/2024. Modified on 2/26/2024 (PP)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Sun 02/25 11:40 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Abrams Artist Agency, LLC. (Dye, Carolyn)
Related: [-]