New York Southern District Court
Judge:Nelson Stephen Roman
Case #: 7:24-cv-01434
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Damion Fray
60 Ronalds Avenue
New Rochelle, NY 10989
Defendant
Jolia Mazzullo
560 Mountainview Avenue Unit 6
Valley Cottage, NY 10989
Represented By
Stephen Lloyd Drummond
Drummond & Squillance, PLLC
contact info
Karen Nadine Wilson
Wilson & Brown, PLLC
contact info
JoAnn Squillace
Drummond & Squillace, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jane/John Doe 1 through Jane/John Doe 25
Defendant
Yakov (Jon) Basmanov
Represented By
Stephen Lloyd Drummond
Drummond & Squillance, PLLC
contact info
Karen Nadine Wilson
Wilson & Brown, PLLC
contact info
JoAnn Squillace
Drummond & Squillace, PLLC
contact info
Nominal Defendant
Mi Casa Es Su Casa II Inc.
Plaintiff
Bozhena Basmanov
Represented By
Andrew C. Laufer
Law Office Of Andrew C. Laufer, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mi Casa Es Su Casa II Inc., et al
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Andrew C. Laufer
Law Office Of Andrew C. Laufer, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Nominal Defendant
AlphaLogix Delivery LLC
Terminated: 05/21/2024


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
61 61 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/30 7:33 PM
JOLIA MAZZULLO'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT re:59 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Prince -Alex Iwu dated April 25, 2025. Document filed by Jolia Mazzullo.(ar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D
60 60 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 04/30 4:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:59 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Prince -Alex Iwu dated April 25, 2025. Opposition arguing amendment is prejudicial and unsupported by evidence . Document filed by Jolia Mazzullo..(Mazzullo, Jolia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Bozhena's Commercial court complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Bozhena' Matrimonial Statement of net worth,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Docket Entries from Rockland County Surrogates Court Confirming That the 2024 Will Remains Pending and Uncontested,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Petition and Cover Sheet Filed by Bozhena Basmanov Submitting the 2020 Will
Friday, April 25, 2025
59 59 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/25 5:30 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Prince -Alex Iwu dated April 25, 2025. Document filed by Bozhena Basmanov..(Iwu, Prince-Alex)
Related: [-]
58 58 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ishmael Green on behalf of Bozhena Basmanov..(Green, Ishmael)
Related: [-]