Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:J P Stadtmueller
Case #: 2:24-cv-00248
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Friday, May 03, 2024
appeal USCA Appeal Fees Fri 05/03 1:47 PM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 605 receipt number MK 95426 re4 Notice of Appeal filed by Vance Fields (ams)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/17 12:28 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1616 USCA re:4 Notice of Appeal filed by Vance Fields. (bx)
Related: [-]
6 6 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 04/17 8:22 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re4 Notice of Appeal (bx)
Related: [-]
5 5 appeal Pro Se Cover Letter Wed 04/17 8:15 AM
Pro Se Cover Letter re:4 Notice of Appeal(bx)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
4 4 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 04/16 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to2 Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255),3 Judgment by Vance Fields. (cc: all counsel) (bx)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 order Judgment Fri 03/15 3:38 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/15/2024. Action DISMISSED with prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Vance Fields at Terre Haute FCI)(jm)
Related: [-]
2 2 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Fri 03/15 3:33 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/15/2024: DENYING1 Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct His Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255; DENYING Certificate of Appealability; and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Vance Fields at Terre Haute FCI)(jm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
1 1 motion Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Mon 02/26 11:10 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) by Vance Fields. (Page 3 not received.)(mew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope