District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Jia M Cobb
Case #: 1:24-cv-00527
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Apr 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By
Clayton Louis Bailey
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By
Michael Bekesha
Judicial Watch, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/17 10:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/03 4:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Bailey, Clayton)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/03 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clayton Louis Bailey on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Bailey, Clayton)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/03 5:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by April 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 3, 2024. (lcjmc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 03/15 2:34 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/4/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/11/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/11/2024(Bekesha, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 02/27 11:43 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/27 11:35 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Mon 02/26 2:22 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/26 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10713404) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Bekesha, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice,
Att: 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General,
Att: 4 Summons U.S. Attorney