Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Emily C Marks
Case #: 2:24-cv-00134
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1350 Alien's action for tort
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 3:54 AM CDT
Defendant
ChangPeng Zhao
Represented By
Sesi V. Garimella
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Anirudh Bansal
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Lauren Ann Riddell
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Samson Aaron Enzer
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Defendant
BAM Trading Services, Inc.
Represented By
Kenneth Daniel Sansom
Spotswood, Sansom & Sansbury, LLC
contact info
Michael Todd Sansbury
Spotswood, Sansom & Sansbury LLC
contact info
Defendant
Binance Holdings, Lts.
Represented By
Sesi V. Garimella
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Anirudh Bansal
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Lauren Ann Riddell
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Samson Aaron Enzer
Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hagar Almog
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Bromberg
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Yoni Diller
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ariel Ein-Gal
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Adin Gess
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lishay Lavi
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Noach Newman
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maya Parizer
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Natalie Sanandaji
Represented By
Mark Goldfeder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
David Schoen
David I Schoen, Atty At Law
contact info
Mark Goldfelder
National Jewish Advocacy Center, Inc.
contact info
Ben Schlager
Goldfeder And Terry, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
83 83 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 7:31 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 74 Motion for Thania (Athanasia) Charmani to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 4/28/2025. (CWL)
Related: [-]