Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen R Clark
Case #: 4:24-mc-00227
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Tue 04/30 8:40 AM
The Court orders that Respondent Mark Quentin Moore be SUSPENDED from the practice of law in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri until further Order of this Court. Signed by Court on 04/29/2024. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
2 2 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Tue 03/05 2:56 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Mark Quentin Moore shall show cause in writing within thirty (30) days after service of this Order why the same discipline ordered by the Supreme Court of the State of Missouri should not be imposed by this Court for one ore more of the reasons set forth in Local Rule 12.02 and the Rules of Disciplinary Enforcement. Order to be sent by email and mail (UPS Trackable/Signature Required) to Respondent. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 03/04/2024. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Attorney Disciplinary Proceedings (misc case - COURT USE ONLY) Mon 02/26 12:24 PM
ATTORNEY DISCIPLINARY PROCEEDING: Order from the Missouri Supreme Court regarding disciplinary action upon Respondent Mark Quentin Moore. (BAS)
Related: [-]