New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:24-cv-01452
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation (Monopolizing Trade)
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Bridgestone Corporation
Defendant
Compagnie Generale Des Etablissements
Defendant
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Defendant
Continental Tire The Americas, LLC
Defendant
Does 1-100
Defendant
Michelin North America, Inc.
Defendant
Nokian Tyres Inc.
Defendant
Nokian Tyres PLC
Defendant
Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC
Defendant
Pirelli & C. S.P.A.
Defendant
Pirelli Tire LLC
Defendant
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Defendant
Bridgestone Americas, Inc.
Represented By
David Lender
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Adam C. Hemlock
Weil, Gotshal & Manges Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Spadafino
Represented By
Jonathan Scott Crevier
Dicello Levitt LLC
contact info
Robin A. Van Der Meulen
Scott & Scott Attorneys At Law LLP
contact info
Gregory Scott Asciolla
Dicello Levitt LLC
contact info
Robin Ann Van Der Meulen
Dicello Levitt LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 20, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 06/20 4:45 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 5:24-rt-55022, filed on 06/20/2024..(bc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
47 47 transfer MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order Tue 06/18 3:14 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/7/2024) (vba)
Related: [-]
transfer MDL Transfer Out Tue 06/18 3:15 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Ohio.(vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
46 46 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/11 9:26 AM
ORDER granting45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re45 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam C. Hemlock dated April 10, 2024. The Court will so order the parties' stipulation, as set forth in paragraph 10 of this letter motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/4/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
45 45 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/10 5:29 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam C. Hemlock dated April 10, 2024. Document filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc...(Hemlock, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
44 44 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/22 11:20 AM
ORDER granting43 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re43 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam C. Hemlock dated March 20, 2024. The Requesting Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended to May 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. answer due 5/7/2024; Continental Tire The Americas, LLC answer due 5/7/2024; Michelin North America, Inc. answer due 5/7/2024; Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC answer due 5/7/2024; Pirelli Tire LLC answer due 5/7/2024; The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company answer due 5/7/2024. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/22/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
43 43 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 03/20 7:06 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Adam C. Hemlock dated March 20, 2024. Document filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc...(Hemlock, Adam)
Related: [-]
42 42 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/20 6:59 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bridgestone Corporation for Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. Document filed by Bridgestone Americas, Inc...(Hemlock, Adam)
Related: [-]
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/20 6:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam C. Hemlock on behalf of Bridgestone Americas, Inc...(Hemlock, Adam)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/20 6:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lender on behalf of Bridgestone Americas, Inc...(Lender, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
39 39 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/08 10:26 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bridgestone Americas, Inc. served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. Service was accepted by Asia Robinson-Lewis, service of process intake clerk. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
38 38 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/06 4:15 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. Service was accepted by John Doe, service of process intake clerk. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
37 37 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/06 4:09 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Pirelli Tire LLC served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. Service was accepted by John Doe, service of process intake clerk. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
36 36 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/06 3:59 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. Service was accepted by Samantha Sutton, service of process intake clerk. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
35 35 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/06 3:55 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Nokian Tyres Inc. served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. Service was accepted by Chimere Brooks, service of process intake clerk. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
34 34 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/06 3:51 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Michelin North America, Inc. served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. Service was accepted by Ingrid Lopez - service of process intake clerk. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
33 33 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/06 3:47 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Continental Tire The Americas, LLC served on 2/29/2024, answer due 3/21/2024. Service was accepted by Ingrid Lopez - service of process intake clerk. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
32 32 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridgestone Americas, Inc...(gp)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pirelli Tire LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michelin North America, Inc...(gp)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Continental Aktiengesellschaft..(gp)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Continental Tire The Americas, LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridgestone Corporation..(gp)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company..(gp)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pirelli & C. S.P.A...(gp)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:29 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:29 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nokian Tyres PLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:28 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nokian Tyres Inc...(gp)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 2:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Compagnie Generale Des Etablissements..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Wed 02/28 12:29 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-00881-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 02/28 12:32 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(tro)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 02/28 12:32 PM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
20 20 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bridgestone Americas, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:53 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bridgestone Corporation, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pirelli Tire LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pirelli & C. S.p.A., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:42 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:39 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nokian Tyres Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nokian Tyres PLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michelin North America, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Compagnie Generale Des Etablissements, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:29 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 2.)Continental Tire the Americas, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 12:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1.)Continental Aktiengesellschaft, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/27 12:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Tue 02/27 11:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gregory Scott Asciolla re: Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add Bridgestone Americas, Inc.. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/27 11:15 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gregory Scott Asciolla to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the party names must be listed on the PDF case caption. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 02/27 11:16 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Scott Asciolla. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/27 11:17 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/27 11:19 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Tue 02/27 11:20 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 24-cv-881. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/27 11:22 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory Scott Asciolla to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party names listed on the attached rider must match party names listed on the docket entry text; the Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B) : a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Tue 02/27 11:28 AM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Bridgestone Corporation, Compagnie Generale Des Etablissements, Continental Aktiengesellschaft, Continental Tire The Americas, LLC, Does 1-100, Michelin North America, Inc., Nokian Tyres Inc., Nokian Tyres PLC, Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC, Pirelli & C. S.P.A., Pirelli Tire LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Bridgestone Americas, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint,.Document filed by Michael Spadafino. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Scott Crevier on behalf of Michael Spadafino..(Crevier, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Ann Van Der Meulen on behalf of Michael Spadafino..(Van Der Meulen, Robin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement of Relatedness Mon 02/26 4:27 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 24-cv-00881. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/26 4:24 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/26 4:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CONTINENTAL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT; CONTINENTAL TIRE THE AMERICAS, LLC; COMPAGNIE GNRALE DES TABLISSEMENTS; MICHELIN NORTH AMERICA, INC.; NOKIAN TYRES PLC; NOKIAN TYRES INC; NOKIAN TYRES U.S. OPERATIONS LLC; THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY; PIRELLI & C. S.P.A.; PIRELLI TIRE LLC; BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION; BRIDGESTONE AMERICAS, INC.; AND DOES 1-100, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Attachment A - Index of Defendants
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/26 4:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/26 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Bridgestone Corporation, Compagnie Generale Des Etablissements, Continental Aktiengesellschaft, Continental Tire The Americas, LLC, Does 1-100, Michelin North America, Inc., Nokian Tyres Inc., Nokian Tyres PLC, Nokian Tyres U.S. Operations LLC, Pirelli & C. S.P.A., Pirelli Tire LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28997309)Document filed by Michael Spadafino..(Asciolla, Gregory)
Related: [-]