Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00203
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12112 American With Disabilities Act- Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 4:56 AM EDT
defendant
Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc.
2279 S. Airport Rd. W.
Traverse City, MI 49684
Represented By
Amanda May Fielder
Warner Norcross & Judd Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
Daniel Brookins
Warner Norcross & Judd Llp (grand Rapids)
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Lee T. Silver
Butzel Long Pc (gr)
contact info
plaintiff
Amy Jones
Represented By
Nicholas Roumel
Roumel Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, January 02, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Thu 01/02 12:24 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss22 and dismissing case with prejudice; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (tmb)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/02 10:32 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice by plaintiff Amy Jones (Roumel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
21 21 order Case Management Order Fri 11/08 8:35 AM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting Stipulation20 : discovery to be completed by 1/31/2025; dispositive motions due by 3/4/2025; settlement conference set for 9/11/2025 at 09:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 10/1/2025 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 10/27/2025 at 09:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (eod)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 11/05 1:43 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadlines by defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (Brookins, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/21 11:18 AM
ORDER Regarding Sealing of Documents; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
18 18 order Protective Order Fri 08/02 10:07 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting Stipulation17 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
17 17 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Thu 08/01 3:38 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (Confidentiality and Protective Order) by defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (Fielder, Amanda)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge (Non-Document) Thu 08/01 3:51 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER (Confidentiality and Protective Order) by defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc.17 to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Wed 07/31 3:58 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending voluntary facilitative mediation deadline to 12/6/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 07/31 9:18 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Voluntary Facilitative Mediation Deadline by defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (Brookins, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Fri 07/26 1:14 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 1039 as to plaintiff Amy Jones (jmw)
Related: [-]
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Fri 07/26 1:17 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 611252 as to defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (jmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
14 14 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Wed 07/24 10:29 AM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Lee T. Silver; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 7/31/2024 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 7/31/2024 (kmd)
Related: [-]
13 13 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Wed 07/24 8:50 AM
SELECTION of Lee Silver as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Amy Jones (Roumel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/17 12:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. for Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Fielder, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service Mon 07/01 12:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. for Initial Disclosures (Fielder, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
10 10 order Case Management Order Thu 05/30 3:04 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 12/2/2024; dispositive motions due by 1/3/2025; settlement conference set for 7/2/2025 at 9:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 7/29/2025 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 8/25/2025 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
9 9 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Wed 05/29 5:50 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Roumel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
8 8 5 pgs order Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report Fri 05/03 3:46 PM
ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 5/31/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/03 3:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (Fielder, Amanda)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/03 3:18 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand Related [+] by Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (Fielder, Amanda)
Related: [-] liance Upon
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 05/03 2:03 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Brookins on behalf of defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (Brookins, Daniel)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 05/03 3:16 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda May Fielder on behalf of defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (Fielder, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
5 5 order Notice of Impending Dismissal Mon 04/29 2:55 PM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL for failure to serve; proof of service to be to be submitted by 5/28/2024 or the case will be dismissed; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/27 11:06 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. (pjw)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Tue 02/27 10:59 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (pjw)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Tue 02/27 7:43 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Roumel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/26 8:39 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Goodwill Industries of Northern Michigan, Inc. filed by Amy Jones (Roumel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 02/26 8:41 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Amy Jones in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7303698 (Roumel, Nicholas)
Related: [-]