New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 3:24-cv-00274
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2024
Re-opened:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 22, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Jonathan Rees
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
200 Washington Avenue, 7181
Endicott, NY 13760
Plaintiff
Jane Doe, IV
Minor 200 Washington Avenue, 7181
Endicott, NY 13760
Plaintiff
John Doe, II
Minor 200 Washington Avenue, 7181
Endicott, NY 13760
Plaintiff
John Doe, III
Minor 200 Washington Avenue, 7181
Endicott, NY 13760

GPO Feb 27 2025
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying with leave to renew 24 Motion for Default Judgment: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum on or before March 21, 2025, not to exceed fifteen pages, showing cause why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to the prior pending action doctrine; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment (Dkt. No. 24) is DENIED WITH LEAVE TO RENEW pending the outcome of the order to show cause; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 02/27/2025. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiffs)(ban)
GPO Mar 17 2025
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jonathan Rees: The Court hereby ORDERS that causes of action one, two, three, four, five, six, seven, eight, nine, ten, eleven, twelve, thirteen, fourteen, fifteen, twenty, and twenty-one are DISMISSED with prejudice; and the Court further ORDERS that the balance of the amended complaint (Dkt. No. 14) is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment (Dkt. No. 24) is DENIED, and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint within thirty (30) days ofthe date of this Memorandum-Decision and Order; and the Court furtherORDERS that if Plaintiffs fail to file a second amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Memorandum-Decision and Order, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment against Plaintiffs and close this case without further order from this Court; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 03/17/2025. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiffs)(ban)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
63 63 motion Default Judgment Fri 05/09 2:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jonathan Rees filed by Jane Doe and John Doe, II. (see) Modified on 5/9/2025 (jel, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of John Doe in support of Entry for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jane Doe in support of Entry for Default
Att: 3 Proposed Order/Judgment,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Fri 05/09 4:59 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY -63 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jonathan Rees - Corrected text to reflect plaintiff's clerk's request for certificate of entry of default. (jel, )
Related: [-]