Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-00315
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2024 1:17 AM CST
Defendant
Clemente Herrera Velasco (1)
Represented By
Ruben James Luna
Law Office Of Ruben J Luna PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 02/27/2024 1:22 AM CST
Saturday, February 24, 2024
Arrest of Clemente Herrera Velasco, filed. (CitlalicDeLeon, 7)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 25, 2024
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Clemente Herrera Velasco (1), filed. Initial Appearance set for 2/26/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (CitlalicDeLeon, 7)
Related: [-]