Washington Western District Court
Judge:Lauren King
Case #: 2:24-cv-00245
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2024
Terminated:Jul 19, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, July 19, 2024
11 11 order Judgment by Court Fri 07/19 12:49 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. For the reasons stated in the Court's 7/19/2024 Order, Dkt. No.10 , judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
10 10 order 1 - Order Fri 07/19 12:49 PM
ORDER Dismissing Action without Prejudice. The Court DISMISSES this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/16 3:29 PM
STRICKEN per the instruction of chambers ***Civil Case Terminated, per 9 Order entered on 6/12/2024. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) Modified on 7/16/2024 (SB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
9 9 order 1 - Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/12 9:53 AM
ORDER: The Court DISMISSES Mr. Willoughby's amended complaint, Dkt. No.7 , without prejudice and with leave to amend. If Mr. Willoughby does not file a second amended complaint by 7/12/2024, this action will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (SS) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
8 8 misc Praecipe for a Summons Thu 05/16 3:15 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS, by Plaintiff Isaiah Thomas Willoughby. (SS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/26 2:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kyle Sherwood, filed by Isaiah Thomas Willoughby. (SS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
6 6 order 1 - Order Mon 03/11 1:41 PM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND WITH LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Lauren King. If Mr. Willoughby does not file a proper amended complaint by April 11, 2024, this action will be dismissed with prejudice.(MIH) (CC: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings Mon 03/11 3:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2024, (MIH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
5 5 cmp Complaint Fri 03/01 1:27 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+], filed by Isaiah Thomas Willoughby. (SS)
Related: [-] ceipt # IFP Granted
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/01 1:22 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(SS) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
3 3 misc Letter Mon 02/26 9:55 AM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
1 1 motion Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 02/26 9:48 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Isaiah Thomas Willoughby before Judge Brian A Tsuchida (CR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit