Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rebecca Beach Smith
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 4:24-cv-00028
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Brian Butcher
Represented By
Amber Bockin
Hancock, Daniel & Johnson, P.C.
contact info
Rodney Seth Dillman
Hancock Daniel Johnson & Nagle PC
contact info
Defendant
Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters
Represented By
Jason Robert Davis
Kaufman & Canoles, P.C.
contact info
Clark James Belote
Kaufman & Canoles Pc (norfolk)
contact info
Defendant
Tamara Dessoffy
Represented By
Amber Bockin
Hancock, Daniel & Johnson, P.C.
contact info
Rodney Seth Dillman
Hancock Daniel Johnson & Nagle PC
contact info
Defendant
Pediatrics at Oyster Point
Represented By
Amber Bockin
Hancock, Daniel & Johnson, P.C.
contact info
Rodney Seth Dillman
Hancock Daniel Johnson & Nagle PC
contact info
Notice
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
United States Attorney's Office 101 West Main Street Suite 8000
Norfolk, VA 23510
Plaintiff
F.P.S.
Plaintiff
Kenneth Bates Smith
7 Miles Cary Road
Newport News, VA 23606
Plaintiff
T.B.S.


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
41 41 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 01/16 3:24 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 1/16/25. (epri, )
Related: [-]
40 40 15 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/16 3:17 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension, ECF No. 31, is GRANTED; all claims asserted against CHKD are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Plaintiffs' request, ECF No. 33; CHKD's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 19, is DISMISSED as moot; and Ms. Dessoffy, Dr. Butcher, and Pediatrics at Oyster Point's Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. 12, 14, and 16, are GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' § 1983 claims. The § 1983 claims asserted on behalf of F.P.S. and T.B.S. are DISMISSED without prejudice, and the § 1983 claims asserted on behalf of Mr. Smith are DISMISSED with prejudice. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' state law claims. Plaintiffs' state law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Copies of this Order sent as DIRECTED on 1.16.25. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 1/16/25. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/10 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Cotto on behalf of Brian Butcher, Tamara Dessoffy, Pediatrics at Oyster Point (Cotto, Anna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 01/07 4:52 PM
ORDER: The Moving Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal of Amber Bockin and Substitution of Anna M. Cotto as Counsel, and the United States' Motion for Withdrawal of Anna M. McKenzie as Counsel, ECF Nos. 35 and 37, are GRANTED. Docket updated and copies of Order sent as DIRECTED on 1.7.25. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 1/7/25. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
37 37 motion Withdraw as Attorney Substitute Attorney Tue 12/17 6:15 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Amber L. Bockin, Esquire , MOTION to Substitute Attorney Anna M. Cotto, Esquire by Brian Butcher, Tamara Dessoffy, Pediatrics at Oyster Point. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
36 36 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 12/17 2:52 PM
Memorandum in Support re35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McKenzie, Anna)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 12/17 2:51 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(McKenzie, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Garry D. Hartlieb on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hartlieb, Garry)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
33 33 motion Dismiss Voluntarily Fri 06/21 1:42 PM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF THE KING'S DAUGHTERS (CHKD) MOTION TO DISMISS by F.P.S., Kenneth Bates Smith, T.B.S.. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/31 9:45 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service Amended and Corrected re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.,21 Roseboro Notice,22 Roseboro Notice,20 Memorandum in Support by Clark James Belote on behalf of Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters (Belote, Clark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/30 11:40 AM
MOTION FOR LEAVE OF THE COURT AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Kenneth Bates Smith. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/29 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Robert Davis on behalf of Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters (Davis, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
29 29 respoth Reply Other Tue 05/28 8:49 AM
Reply to Pro Se Plaintiff's Late Opposition filed by Brian Butcher, Tamara Dessoffy, Pediatrics at Oyster Point. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
28 28 notice Notice (other) Thu 05/23 10:06 AM
NOTICE by Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Belote, Clark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
27 27 respm Response to Motion Tue 05/21 5:01 PM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO TAMARA DESSOFFY, BRIAN BUTCHER, AND PEDIATRICS AT OYSTER POINT MOTION TO DISMISS filed by F.P.S., Kenneth Bates Smith, T.B.S. (epri, )
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Waiver of Tue 05/21 12:17 PM
Waiver of re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.,18 Roseboro Notice,15 Memorandum in Support by Brian Butcher (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Waiver of Tue 05/21 12:15 PM
Waiver of re17 Memorandum in Support,16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.,18 Roseboro Notice by Pediatrics at Oyster Point (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Waiver of Tue 05/21 12:12 PM
Waiver of re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.,13 Memorandum in Support,18 Roseboro Notice by Tamara Dessoffy (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
23 23 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Wed 05/01 12:42 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters. (Belote, Clark)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
22 22 misc Roseboro Notice Mon 04/29 12:16 PM
Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss of Childrens Hospital of The Kings Daughters, Incorporated Amended Roseboro Notice by Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters (Belote, Clark)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Roseboro Notice Mon 04/29 12:06 PM
Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss of Childrens Hospital of The Kings Daughters, Incorporated by Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters (Belote, Clark)
Related: [-]
20 20 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 04/29 12:04 PM
Memorandum in Support re19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters. (Belote, Clark)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/29 12:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters. (Belote, Clark)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
18 18 misc Roseboro Notice Fri 04/26 4:20 PM
Roseboro Notice to Pro Se Plaintiff K. Smith re Motions to Dismiss by Brian Butcher, Tamara Dessoffy, Pediatrics at Oyster Point (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
17 17 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 04/26 4:18 PM
Memorandum in Support re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Pediatrics at Oyster Point. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/26 4:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Pediatrics at Oyster Point. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
15 15 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 04/26 4:17 PM
Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Brian Butcher. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/26 4:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Brian Butcher. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
13 13 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 04/26 4:14 PM
Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Tamara Dessoffy. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/26 4:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Tamara Dessoffy. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/25 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re10 NOTICE (McKenzie, Anna)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (other) Thu 04/25 3:51 PM
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re2 NOTICE (McKenzie, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/29 12:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pediatrics at Oyster Point. Pediatrics at Oyster Point waiver sent on 2/27/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Bockin, Amber)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/22 10:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters waiver sent on 2/27/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (epri, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Docket Annotation Fri 03/22 10:25 AM
Local Rule 83.1(M) Certification, re4 by Kenneth Bates Smith. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tamara Dessoffy. Tamara Dessoffy waiver sent on 3/19/2024 2/27/2024, answer due 5/20/2024 4/29/2024. (Bockin, Amber) Modified on 3/19/2024 (epri, )
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/19 3:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brian Butcher. Brian Butcher waiver sent on 3/19/2024 2/27/2024, answer due 5/20/2024 4/29/24. (Bockin, Amber) Modified on 3/19/2024 (epri, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/11 5:04 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file the required Ghostwriting Certification Form within fourteen days of the date of entry of this Order. A copy of this Order and a copy of the court's Ghostwriting Certification Form sent to Plaintiffs as DIRECTED on 3.11.24. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 3/11/24. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 11:17 AM
Four (4) Summonses Issued as to Brian Butcher, Childrens Hospital of the King's Daughters, Tamara Dessoffy, Pediatrics at Oyster Point. Service packets mailed to pro se plaintiff on 2.28.24.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
2 2 notice Notice (other) Tue 02/27 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION by F.P.S., Kenneth Bates Smith, T.B.S. re1 Complaint, (epri, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/27 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Brian Butcher, Childrens Hospital of the Kings Daughters, Tamara Dessoffy, Pediatrics at Oyster Point ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number 400000796.), filed by Kenneth Bates Smith, T.B.S., F.P.S..(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Receipt