Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:24-cv-00209
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024

Debtor
Cummings Manookian, PLLC

,
Represented By
Jay Robert Lefkovitz
Lefkovitz & Lefkovitz
contact info
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 7:07 AM CDT
Appellant
Brian Manookian
Represented By
John Tate Spragens
Spragens Law PLC
contact info
Appellee
Jeanne Ann Burton
Represented By
Phillip G. Young, Jr.
Thompson Burton PLLC
contact info
Creditor
D.F. Chase, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel H. Puryear
Puryear Pippenger & Cook PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Grant, Konvalinka & Harrison, P.C.
Represented By
John P. Konvalinka
Grant, Konvalinka & Harrison, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Afsoon Hagh
Represented By
Glenn B. Rose
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Craig V. Gabbert, Jr.
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Interested Party
Teresa Azan
Interested Party
Kyle Craddock
Interested Party
Jeremy Keimer
Interested Party
Lauren Quarles
Interested Party
Lolitha Scruggs
Interested Party
US Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee 701 Broadway Suite 318
Nashville, TN 37203

GPO Oct 15 2024
MEMORANDUM and ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Before the court is Trustee Jeanne Anne Burton's Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal. (Doc. No. 4.) Because the Notice of Appeal was filed one day late and the appellant did not seek to extend the filing deadline within the twenty-one days allowed by Rule 8002(d) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Trustees Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal (Doc. No. 4) is GRANTED, and this appeal is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/15/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 5 pgs order Memorandum Opinion of the Court Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/15 8:11 PM
MEMORANDUM and ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Before the court is Trustee Jeanne Anne Burton's Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal. (Doc. No.4 .) Because the Notice of Appeal was filed one day late and the appellant did not seek to extend the filing deadline within the twenty-one days allowed by Rule 8002(d) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Trustees Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal (Doc. No.4 ) is GRANTED, and this appeal is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/15/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 06/06 1:20 PM
REPLY to Response to re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal) filed by Jeanne Ann Burton. (Young, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/31 8:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal) filed by Brian Manookian. (Spragens, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/15 4:01 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Appellant Brian Manookian shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal (Doc. No.4 ) by May 31, 2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/15/2024. (mg)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/15 8:28 AM
NOTICE by Jeanne Ann Burton re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal) Notice of Unsuccessful Mediation and Renewed Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal (Young, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/02 11:58 AM
ORDER: Trustee/Appellee has filed a Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule (Doc. No.5 ) that is not opposed by the appellant (Doc. No.9 ). The motion is hereby GRANTED, so that the parties may engage in mediation at the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. Any response date to the Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal (Doc. No.4 ) will be set in a later order of the court. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/2/2024. (af)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
9 9 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/01 11:36 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule ,4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal) filed by Brian Manookian. (Spragens, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
8 8 appeal Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Mon 03/25 4:09 PM
Notice of Briefing Schedule: Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8018(a)(1), the appellants shall serve and file a brief within 30 days from the date the appeal was received and entered on the docket of this court. Appellant Brief due by 4/24/2024. (hb)
Related: [-]
7 7 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Mon 03/25 4:01 PM
APPEALLANT'S DESIGNATION OF RECORD FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, filed by Brian Manookian.(hb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 19-07235 Bankruptcy Designations Part 1,
Att: 2 Attachment 19-07235 Bankruptcy Designations Part 2,
Att: 3 Attachment 19-07235 Bankruptcy Designations Part 3,
Att: 4 Attachment 19-07235 Bankruptcy Designations Part 4,
Att: 5 Attachment 19-07235 Bankruptcy Designations Part 5,
Att: 6 Attachment 20-90002 Adversary Designations
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate Wed 03/20 10:35 AM
CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service filed by Jeanne Ann Burton re5 MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule filed by Jeanne Ann Burton,4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal) filed by Jeanne Ann Burton. (Young, Phillip)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Wed 03/20 9:39 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#4 ,5 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for these documents. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
5 5 motion Stay Mon 03/18 11:32 AM
MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule by Jeanne Ann Burton. (Young, Phillip)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 03/18 11:29 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss Untimely Appeal) by Jeanne Ann Burton. (Young, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 02/27 11:38 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 02/27 11:38 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 02/27 11:39 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Phillip G. Young, Jr, Jay Robert Lefkovitz, Daniel H. Puryear, John P. Konvalinka, Craig V. Gabbert, Jr, Glenn B. Rose, John Tate Spragens admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Tue 02/27 11:31 AM
SHORT RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT case number 3:19-bk-07235, filed Brian Manookian.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Attachment - USBC Docket Report,
Att: 3 Attachment - Order Granting Trustee's Motion to Approve Compromise and Settlement,
Att: 4 Attachment - Order Finding Brian Manookian Lacks Standing to Object to the Trustee's Motion for Compromise and Settlement