Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:24-cv-00508
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024
Case in other court:Fifth Judicial Circuit, Hernando County, 2023-CA-1818
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Rachel E. Eilers
Hill Ward Henderson
contact info
Ethen Rubin Shapiro
Hill Ward Henderson PA
contact info
Defendant
Whitaker Contracting Corp
Represented By
E. Glenn Waldrop, Jr.
Lightfoot Franklin White
contact info
Jacob Miller Salow
Lightfoot Franklin White
contact info
Plaintiff
Sterling Hill Community Development District
Represented By
Adam C. King
Law Office Of Adam C. King P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
25 25 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/16 9:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and upon review of 24 the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear attorneys' fees and costs as set forth in the Parties' settlement agreement. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/16/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 09/30 2:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Whitaker Contracting Corp. (Waldrop, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
23 23 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 09/05 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABM)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/05 10:26 AM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and upon review of 21 Plaintiff's Notice of Anticipated Resolution, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Parties may, within sixty (60) calendar days from the date of this Order, submit a final stipulation of dismissal or any party may seek to reopen the case, upon good cause shown. After the sixty (60)-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/5/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of settlement Fri 08/30 11:47 AM
NOTICE of settlement and Anticipated Resolution by Sterling Hill Community Development District (King, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
20 20 adr Notice of selection of mediator Wed 05/08 8:08 AM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of James L. Nulman, Esq. as mediator by Whitaker Contracting Corp. (Waldrop, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
19 19 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 04/18 4:04 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2024 Discovery due by 12/31/2024 Dispositive motions due by 11/15/2024 Pretrial statement due by 3/21/2025 Jury Trial set for 6/2/2025 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 7 A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/20/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/18/2024. (BCH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
18 18 misc Case Management Report Wed 03/27 10:53 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Waldrop, E.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/19 11:07 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sterling Hill Community Development District. (King, Adam)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of appearance Tue 03/19 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C. King on behalf of Sterling Hill Community Development District (King, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/15 8:48 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Whitaker Contracting Corp.'s 14 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission as to attorney E. Glenn Waldrop, Jr. If counsel has not already done so, within fourteen (14) days hereof, he shall complete the e-filer registration (more information available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 3/15/2024. (ACL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 6:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION for E. Glenn Waldrop, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21872863 for $150 by Whitaker Contracting Corp. (Salow, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
misc Disbursement Voucher / Refund Wed 03/06 12:56 PM
REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-21809326 refunded in the amount of $ $405.00 paid to HWH Personal Injury.. (NLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
13 13 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 02/29 4:20 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Whitaker Contracting Corp.(Salow, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of consent to join Wed 02/28 6:33 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Whitaker Contracting Corp (JOINDER AND CONSENT TO REMOVAL) . (Salow, Jacob)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/28 4:47 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Whitaker Contracting Corp. (Salow, Jacob)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/28 4:46 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Whitaker Contracting Corp.(Salow, Jacob)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Wed 02/28 4:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Jacob M. Salow Appearance by Jacob Miller Salow on behalf of Whitaker Contracting Corp (Salow, Jacob)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/28 1:25 PM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 02/28 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Adam King of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
6 6 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/27 4:43 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-00508-MSS-CPT. (TRF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/27 1:13 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Eilers, Rachel)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/27 1:09 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Eilers, Rachel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of appearance Tue 02/27 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel E. Eilers on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Eilers, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of appearance Tue 02/27 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ethen Rubin Shapiro on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Shapiro, Ethen)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/27 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial Circuit, Hernando County, case number 23-CA-1818 filed in State Court on 12/21/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21809592 filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Shapiro, Ethen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit B