Cure v. Aldridge et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lisa G Wood |
Referred: | Benjamin W Cheesbro |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00030 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 4:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Buck Aldridge
|
|
Defendant
Jim Proctor
|
|
Plaintiff
Mary Cure
|
Represented By
|
1. | Family of exonerated Georgia man files $16 million federal lawsuit against deputy who fatally shot him (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/29/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/04 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Buck Aldridge. (cmr) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 03/04 2:29 PM
Summons Submitted (Pacella, Mario) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1)
Fri 03/01 3:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Mary Cure. (Pacella, Mario) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other) Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 02/27 3:53 PM
NOTICE of filing deficiency re2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/12/2024.(wwp) |
|
Att: 1 Disclosure 7.1 | ||
4 | 4
order
Rule 26(f) Order
Tue 02/27 1:23 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/27/24. (wwp) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/27 11:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Jim Proctor. (wwp) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/27 11:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mary Cure. (wwp) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/27 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Buck Aldridge, Jim Proctor, filed by Mary Cure.(wwp) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 02/27 11:53 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AGASDC -3774625. (wwp) |