Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 4:24-cv-00171
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2024
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 24, 2024 3:50 AM CDT
Defendant
Robin Duty
Defendant
USA
Represented By
Shannon S. Smith
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Larry D Muldrow
6502 Countryside Drive
Texarkana, AR 71854

GPO Feb 27 2024
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to issue summons for the United States Attorney General, the United States Attorney for the ED AR, the Department of Veteran's Affairs, and Robin Duty and mail them to Muldrow; and directing Muldrow to serve each defendant with a copy of the summons, 1 Complaint and 2 Amended Complaint by 5/27/2024. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/27/2024. (csf)
GPO Sep 19 2024
ORDER granting 9 United States' motion to dismiss; dismissing Larry Muldrow's complaint; dismissing with prejudice his tort claims; dismissing without prejudice his constitutional claims; and denying 6 motion for preliminary injunction and 12 motion to stay. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/19/2024. (ljb)
GPO Sep 19 2024
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 13 order entered today, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/19/2024. (ljb)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
38 38 utility Notice of Docket Correction Fri 03/14 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re37 Affidavit. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (illegible page). The correct document was added to docket entry37 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Affidavit Fri 03/14 12:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Larry D Muldrow. (adj) (jak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/14/2025) Main Document - Correct
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
36 36 30+ pgs motion Order Tue 02/11 2:24 PM
MOTION to Continue this Process for Discovery. Filed by Larry D Muldrow. (jap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
35 35 misc Affidavit Wed 01/29 3:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Larry D Muldrow. (jap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/17 8:02 AM
NOTICE by Larry D Muldrow. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
33 33 15 pgs motion Order Tue 01/14 3:04 PM
MOTION for Order filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
32 32 10 pgs motion Order Wed 12/11 4:26 PM
MOTION for Order by Larry D Muldrow. (jap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
31 31 motion Compel Wed 11/27 8:57 AM
MOTION to Compel filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
30 30 misc Addendum Mon 11/25 1:39 PM
SUPPLEMENT to 3rd Amended Tort Claim Docket24 and28 filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/22 3:02 PM
REPLY to Response to21 MOTION to Compel filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
28 28 brief Brief in Support Fri 11/22 2:30 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of27 Motion to Strike filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Strike Fri 11/22 2:29 PM
MOTION to Strike/Quash filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/22 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Conflict of Interest filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
utility Notice of Docket Correction Tue 11/19 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re25 MOTION to Compel. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed and to establish linkage as "RESPONSE re21 Motion to Compel filed by USA" as marked on the document. (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
25 25 motion Compel Mon 11/18 3:46 PM
MOTION to Compel Response by USA (Smith, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
24 24 misc Addendum Fri 11/15 11:05 AM
SUPPLEMENT to22 Motion to Amend. (llg)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Addendum Fri 11/15 9:55 AM
SUPPLEMENT to Docket #22 Motion to Amend filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Amend/Correct Fri 11/15 9:37 AM
MOTION to Amend filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Compel Fri 11/15 9:17 AM
MOTION to Compel filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 9 pgs motion Order Fri 11/08 12:45 PM
MOTION for Order filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extend Time Fri 11/08 12:45 PM
MOTION to Extend Time filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Mon 10/28 12:16 PM
MOTION to Amend by Larry D Muldrow. (jap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
17 17 motion Sanctions Wed 10/23 9:45 AM
MOTION for Sanctions filed by Larry D Muldrow. (adj)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Fri 10/18 2:51 PM
MOTION to Amend2 Complaint Federal Tort Claim by Larry D Muldrow.(adj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Federal Tort Claim
15 15 motion Reconsideration Fri 10/18 2:35 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Larry D Muldrow. (adj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 order Judgment Thu 09/19 1:53 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with13 order entered today, this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/19/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
13 13 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay Thu 09/19 1:48 PM
ORDER granting9 United States' motion to dismiss; dismissing Larry Muldrow's complaint; dismissing with prejudice his tort claims; dismissing without prejudice his constitutional claims; and denying6 motion for preliminary injunction and12 motion to stay. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/19/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Mon 08/05 2:54 PM
MOTION to Stay filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
11 11 respm Response to Motion Thu 07/25 3:16 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by USA. (Smith, Shannon)
Related: [-]
10 10 brief Brief in Support Thu 07/25 3:15 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re9 Motion to Dismiss filed by USA.(Smith, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
9 9 motion Dismiss Thu 07/25 3:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by USA (Smith, Shannon)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/25 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon S. Smith on behalf of USA (Smith, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/22 4:01 PM
NOTICE to the Court filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 07/15 2:45 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Larry D Muldrow. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/30 11:13 AM
NOTICE re Service of Process. Filed by Larry D Muldrow. (jap)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/24 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Service of Process by Larry D Muldrow. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
service Summons Issued Wed 02/28 11:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Robin Duty, Department of Veterans Affairs; and as to USA (to United States Attorney General and United States Attorney for ED AR) and mailed to Plaintiff for service. (csf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/27 2:53 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to issue summons for the United States Attorney General, the United States Attorney for the ED AR, the Department of Veteran's Affairs, and Robin Duty and mail them to Muldrow; and directing Muldrow to serve each defendant with a copy of the summons,1 Complaint and2 Amended Complaint by 5/27/2024. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/27/2024. (csf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/27 9:53 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Larry D Muldrow.(csf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/27 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Larry D Muldrow. Fee $405, Receipt Number LIT5446. No summons issued. Copy mailed. (csf)
Related: [-]