California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:24-cv-01168
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404
Defendant
ByteDance Ltd.
Defendant
Facebook Operations LLC
Defendant
Facebook Payments Inc.
Defendant
Instagram LLC
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
Defendant
Siculus Inc.
Defendant
TikTok Inc.
TikTok Inc. 5800 Bristol Parkway Suite 100
Culver City, CA 90230
Defendant
TikTok LLC
251 Little Falls Drive
Wilmington, DE 19808
Defendant
TikTok Ltd
Defendant
Snap Inc.
Plaintiff
Alberto Flores
Represented By
James R Marsh
Marsh Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 02/27 12:38 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/12/2024. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/27 11:45 AM
Proposed Summons. (Marsh, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/27 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19163338.). Filed by Alberto Flores.(Marsh, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Addendum to SFC,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet