Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:24-cv-00261
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:09 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
HIT Promotional Products, Inc.
Represented By
Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Morris James LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Dynamite Marketing, Inc.
Represented By
John David Simmons
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
contact info
Dennis James Butler
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
contact info
Keith Aaron Jones
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
contact info
Michael Cukor
contact info
Defendant
HIT Promotional Products, Inc.
Represented By
Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Morris James LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dynamite Marketing, Inc.
Represented By
John David Simmons
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
contact info
Dennis James Butler
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
contact info
Keith Aaron Jones
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
contact info
Michael Cukor
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
17 17 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Wed 09/25 8:47 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (lnb)
Related: [-]
16 16 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 09/25 8:43 AM
SO ORDERED, re15 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/25/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/24 11:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dynamite Marketing, Inc.. (Butler, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 09/05 1:08 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Justin P. Miller for HIT Promotional Products, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 09/04 1:25 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Herbert W. Larson for HIT Promotional Products, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
14 14 order Order Tue 09/03 11:44 AM
ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, not later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed Scheduling Order in this action consistent with the applicable form Scheduling Order of Judge Williams, which is posted at http://www/ded/uscourts.gov (See Chambers, Judge Williams, Forms), along with a cover letter requesting the Court to enter the joint proposed Scheduling Order (if there are no disputes or other issues concerning scheduling that the Court needs to address) or to schedule the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. If there are disputes or other issues the Court needs to address in the joint proposed Scheduling Order, in the cover letter, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in the joint proposed Scheduling Order which those appear. ORDERED by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/3/24. (jaa)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 04/05 3:16 PM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Dynamite Marketing, Inc..(Simmons, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Wed 03/20 11:14 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by HIT Promotional Products, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 03/20 11:13 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Dynamite Marketing, Inc. by HIT Promotional Products, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
order SO ORDERED Tue 03/12 9:04 AM
SO ORDERED, re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Herbert W. Larson and Attorney Justin P. Miller filed by HIT Promotional Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 3/12/24. (ntl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
10 10 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Mon 03/11 4:10 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Herbert W. Larson and Justin P. Miller. ( re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Herbert W. Larson and Attorney Justin P. Miller )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4358483).(Dorsney, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/11 4:04 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Herbert W. Larson and Attorney Justin P. Miller - filed by HIT Promotional Products, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
order SO ORDERED Thu 03/07 3:16 PM
SO ORDERED, re6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent E. McGeary filed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc.,5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Cukor filed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 3/7/24. (ntl)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 03/08 8:23 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael Cukor for Dynamite Marketing, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (oam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/06 12:50 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/28 3:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc..HIT Promotional Products, Inc. served on 2/28/2024, answer due 3/20/2024. (Simmons, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
7 7 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Tue 02/27 4:26 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Michael Cukor and Vincent E. McGeary. ( re6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent E. McGeary,5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Cukor )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4349110).(Simmons, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/27 4:22 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Vincent E. McGeary - filed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc.. (Simmons, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/27 4:19 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Cukor - filed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc.. (Simmons, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 02/27 3:15 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (apk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Tue 02/27 3:14 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) D751,877 S. (apk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 02/27 3:14 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/27 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against HIT Promotional Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4348605.) - filed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc.(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Tue 02/27 3:20 PM
No Summons Issued. (apk)
Related: [-]