Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 3:24-cv-00185
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Danielle Brown
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Janille Whitaker
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Douglas Wardlow
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Employees of the Indiana Department of Correction
Defendant
Deborah Taylor
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Officer Cross
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Jason Nowatzke
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Ron Neal
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Lieutenant Smith
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Kmitta
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Art Kaufman
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Beal
Represented By
Brandyn L Arnold
contact info
Gustavo A Jimenez
contact info
Erica L Sawyer
contact info
Thomas S Pratt
contact info
Mediator
Robert Edwards, Jr
Plaintiff
Mysti Valencia
Represented By
Maria Makar
Loevy & Loevy - Chi/il
contact info
Megan Pierce
Loevy & Loevy - Chi/il
contact info
Locke E Bowman
Loevy & Loevy - Chi/il
contact info
Jon Loevy
Loevy & Loevy - Chi/il
contact info
Arthur Loevy
Loevy & Loevy - Chi/il
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
98 98 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 05/01 12:28 PM
ORDER granting97 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline for Completion of Discovery is 10/17/2025. Expert Discovery deadline is 10/17/2025. Fact Discovery deadline is 7/31/2025. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 10/2/2025. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 9/2/2025. Dispositive motions to be filed by 12/17/2025. Discovery related Motions due by 10/17/2025.Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/1/2025. No pdf attached. (djs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
97 97 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/30 12:59 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Mysti Valencia. (Pierce, Megan)
Related: [-]