Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Karoline Mehalchick
Case #: 3:24-cv-00334
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Ann Genett
Represented By
Alyssa Michelle Hicks
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
John E. Freund, III
King Spry Herman Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Gilroy
Represented By
Alyssa Michelle Hicks
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
John E. Freund, III
King Spry Herman Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Lalli
Represented By
Alyssa Michelle Hicks
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
John E. Freund, III
King Spry Herman Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Scranton School District
Represented By
Alyssa Michelle Hicks
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
John E. Freund, III
King Spry Herman Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Erica Stolan
Represented By
Alyssa Michelle Hicks
King, Spry, Herman, Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
John E. Freund, III
King Spry Herman Freund & Faul, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DH
Represented By
Todd J. O'Malley
O'Malley & Langan P.C.
contact info
J Joseph Grady
O'Malley & Langan
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Hartzell
Represented By
Todd J. O'Malley
O'Malley & Langan P.C.
contact info
J Joseph Grady
O'Malley & Langan
contact info
Plaintiff
Courtny Roberts
Represented By
Todd J. O'Malley
O'Malley & Langan P.C.
contact info
J Joseph Grady
O'Malley & Langan
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph Lalli, Erica Stolan, Daniel Gilroy, Scranton School District, Ann Genett Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 3/31/2025. (cw)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/29 10:21 AM
ORDER, Ann Genett answer due 5/13/2025; Daniel Gilroy answer due 5/13/2025; Joseph Lalli answer due 5/13/2025; Scranton School District answer due 5/13/2025; Erica Stolan answer due 5/13/2025. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 4/29/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Fri 04/25 3:25 PM
RESPONSE by DH to15 Order to Show Cause, . (Moran, Luke)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 04/25 11:26 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before Friday, May 2, 2025, counsel for the plaintiff shall show cause why they failed to file their amended complaint as directed in this Courts order (Doc. 14) dated March 31, 2025. Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2025. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 4/25/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/31 7:44 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss7 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: 1. Counts I and III are DISMISSED without prejudice. 2. Counts VII XI as asserted against the District are DISMISSED with prejudice. 3. Counts VII and XI as asserted against Individual Defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. 4. Count XIII is DISMISSED with prejudice. 5. Defendants motion to dismiss DENIED on every other basis.7 . 6. Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint setting forth allegations in support of this civil action against Defendants and curing the deficiencies outlined herein, within 21 days of this Order, on or before April 21, 2025. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 3/31/2025 (cw)
Related: [-]
13 13 27 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Mon 03/31 7:42 AM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Joseph Lalli, Erica Stolan, Daniel Gilroy, Scranton School District, Ann Genett Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 3/31/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/09 7:36 PM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER - Use of Generative Artificial Intelligence ("AI"). See Order for details. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 9/9/2024. (cd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Fri 08/30 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Thomas Moran on behalf of DH (Moran, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 08/28 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Patrick Moran on behalf of DH (Moran, Luke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 05/23 8:18 AM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DH, Matthew Hartzell, Courtny Roberts.(O'Malley, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 14 pgs respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 05/10 5:41 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ann Genett, Daniel Gilroy, Joseph Lalli, Scranton School District, Erica Stolan.(Hicks, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 26, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 04/26 1:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ann Genett, Daniel Gilroy, Joseph Lalli, Scranton School District, Erica Stolan.(Hicks, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, March 04, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/04 6:57 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by DH. All Defendants. (O'Malley, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 02/29 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Michelle Hicks on behalf of Ann Genett, Daniel Gilroy, Joseph Lalli, Scranton School District, Erica Stolan(Hicks, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 02/29 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Freund, III on behalf of All Defendants(Freund, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/29 9:49 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT ORDER. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 2/29/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/27 3:19 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 51 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/27 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6559788), filed by Matthew Hartzell, DH, Courtny Roberts.(dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet