Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Arenda L Wright Allen
Referred: Lawrence R Leonard
Case #: 4:24-cv-00029
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court for the City of Newport News, CL2304749B-00
Last checked: Sunday Aug 25, 2024 5:35 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Prime Alliance Bank, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Ashley Champaign
Foley & Lardner Llp (dc)
contact info
Wesley Harward
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Molly Freas Hayssen
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
David James Jordan
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Wesley F. Harward
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
St. Louis Bank
Represented By
Lauren Ashley Champaign
Foley & Lardner Llp (dc)
contact info
Molly Freas Hayssen
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Aery Aviation, LLC
Represented By
Christopher D. Davis
Davis Law, PLC
contact info
Justin Raimondo Burch
Davis Law, PLC
contact info
Erin Christine McDaniel
Davis Law, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Prime Alliance Bank, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren Ashley Champaign
Foley & Lardner Llp (dc)
contact info
Wesley Harward
Foley & Lardner, LLP
contact info
Molly Freas Hayssen
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Wesley F. Harward
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
St. Louis Bank
Represented By
Lauren Ashley Champaign
Foley & Lardner Llp (dc)
contact info
Molly Freas Hayssen
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Aery Aviation, LLC
Represented By
Christopher D. Davis
Davis Law, PLC
contact info
Justin Raimondo Burch
Davis Law, PLC
contact info
Erin Christine McDaniel
Davis Law, PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
GovCon Capital, LLC
Terminated: 05/23/2024


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
35 35 6 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Wed 05/07 10:47 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/13/2026 at 10:00 AM at the courthouse in Norfolk. Bench Trial set for 3/3/2026 at 10:00 AM at the courthouse in Newport News. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/6/2025. (lcur)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
minutes Scheduling Conference-Rule16b Mon 05/05 10:13 AM
Telephone Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 5/5/2025. (lcur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
34 34 order Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order Thu 04/03 3:03 PM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2025 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard and filed on 4/3/2025. (lhow)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
33 33 14 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 03/17 9:15 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/17/25. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
32 32 10 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/19 4:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION under Rule 64 for Detinue and Repossession filed by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank. (Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
31 31 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Thu 02/13 4:14 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re29 MOTION under Rule 64 for Detinue and Repossession filed by Aery Aviation, LLC. (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
30 30 respoth Brief in Support Thu 01/30 4:28 PM
Brief in Support to29 MOTION under Rule 64 for Detinue and Repossession filed by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank.(Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Thu 01/30 4:19 PM
MOTION under Rule 64 for Detinue and Repossession by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank. (Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 09/04 4:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank. (Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
27 27 respoth Opposition Thu 08/29 1:50 PM
Opposition to26 Memorandum in Support,,25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aery Aviation, LLC. (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
26 26 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 08/15 2:15 PM
Memorandum in Support re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank.(Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8.A,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8.B,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8.C,
Att: 12 Exhibit 8.D,
Att: 13 Exhibit 8.E,
Att: 14 Exhibit 8.F,
Att: 15 Exhibit 8.G,
Att: 16 Exhibit 9,
Att: 17 Exhibit 10,
Att: 18 Exhibit 11,
Att: 19 Exhibit 12,
Att: 20 Exhibit 13,
Att: 21 Exhibit 14,
Att: 22 Exhibit 14.A,
Att: 23 Exhibit 14.B,
Att: 24 Exhibit 14.C,
Att: 25 Exhibit 14.D,
Att: 26 Exhibit 14.E
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Thu 08/15 2:13 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank. (Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
24 24 misc Report of Rule 26 f Planning Meeting Wed 08/07 11:31 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank. (Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 06/28 9:18 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Ashley Champaign terminated. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 6/28/24. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 06/26 12:46 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank.(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 23, 2024
21 21 order Preliminary Injunction Thu 05/23 12:41 PM
ORDER ENTERING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/23/2024.(tameub, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Thu 05/23 12:38 PM
ORDER granting15 Stipulated and Joint Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/23/2024. (tameub, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
19 19 respoth Brief in Support Wed 05/22 6:41 PM
Brief in Support to15 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Stipulated and in Response to 16 ORDER filed by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank. (Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Freas Hayssen on behalf of Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank (Hayssen, Molly)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/22 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aery Aviation, LLC (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order Mon 05/20 10:52 AM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file a brief by May 22, 2024 addressing (1) any compelling reasons, and the legal basis, for the Court to grant the requested preliminary injunction despite the presence of an unserved defendant, (2) the impact, if any, that the stipulated preliminary injunction will have on unserved Defendant GovCon, and (3) whether Plaintiff Aery anticipates serving Defendant GovCon by the May 28, 2024 deadline. A ruling on the Stipulated and Joint Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 15) is DEFERRED until the Court receives the requested briefing, at which time the Court shall determine whether to continue the deferral until after Defendant GovCon is either served and provides its position on the Motion or dismissed from the instant case for lack of service. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 5/20/24. (mrees, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
15 15 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 05/17 5:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Stipulated by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc., St. Louis Bank.(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, May 10, 2024
14 14 respoth Answer to Counterclaim Fri 05/10 2:34 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim re13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Aery Aviation, LLC. (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 04/19 6:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Aery Aviation, LLC by St. Louis Bank.(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
12 12 6 pgs respoth Answer to Counterclaim Wed 03/27 3:47 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim re11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Aery Aviation, LLC. (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 03/25 12:38 PM
Corrected ANSWER to Complaint to include exhibits , COUNTERCLAIM against Aery Aviation, LLC by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc..(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Friday, March 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 03/15 9:13 AM
ORDER granting9 a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wesley Harward, as certified by local counsel Lauren Champaign for Defendant Prime Alliance Bank, Inc. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 03/15/2024. (Allen, Arenda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/14 3:06 PM
Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Wesley Harward and Certification of Local Counsel Lauren Champaign by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc..(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 03/07 1:36 PM
ORDER granting6 a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David James Jordan, as certified by local counsel Lauren Champaign for Defendant Prime Alliance Bank, Inc. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 03/07/2024. (Allen, Arenda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 03/06 2:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Aery Aviation, LLC by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc..(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/06 2:38 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David James Jordan and Certification of Local Counsel Lauren Champaign Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9400560. by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc..(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/06 2:35 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Wesley F. Harward and Certification of Local Counsel Lauren Champaign Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9400542. by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc..(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/06 2:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc.. (Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Thu 03/07 9:58 AM
Notice of Correction re5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Wesley F. Harward and Certification of Local Counsel Lauren Champaign Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9400542. Counsel is advised that the application must have applicant's original signature. Counsel does not have to pay another filing fee. (bcorn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 03/01 12:00 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Aery Aviation, LLC. (McDaniel, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
misc Notice of Correction Thu 02/29 11:16 AM
Notice of Correction re1 Notice of Removal. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1, a Citizenship Disclosure Form should be filed in any case noting a diversity of citizenship jurisdiction. The form can be found on our internet site and should promptly be filed. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
2 2 utility Mag Notice / Judge Information Wed 02/28 11:44 AM
Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 02/27 6:04 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9386227.), filed by Prime Alliance Bank, Inc..(Champaign, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 87 pgs Exhibit A
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 02/28 11:44 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
Related: [-]